Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Karlheinz Feldkamp (until 1978-06-30) | 1934-06-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uli Stein (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-10-23 | ||||
Gerd Siese (until 1977-06-30) | 1944-01-05 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Eduard Angele (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-12-10 | ||||
Hans-Werner Moors (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-07-24 | ||||
Manfred Wolf (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-01-13 | ||||
Wolfgang Berg (until 1977-12-31) | 1951-05-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Pohl (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-12-30 | ||||
Norbert Eilenfeldt (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-02-17 | ||||
Roland Peitsch (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-09-01 | ||||
Karl-Hermann Eickhoff (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-11-28 | ||||
Wolfgang Mittendorf (until 1977-08-14) | 1953-04-29 | ||||
Jonny Hey (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-09-21 | ||||
Thomas Ellenberg (until 1977-06-30) | 1957-11-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Christian Sackewitz (from 1976-11-21) (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Wolfgang Schilling (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-06-09 | ||||
Ewald Lienen (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Harry Erhart (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-07-03 | ||||
Norbert Siefke (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-07-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1977-05-29 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-06-04 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-06-11 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |