Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Lucas (until 1978-12-23) | 1920-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernhard Hartmann (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-05-25 | ||||
Manfred Eiben (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-11-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Alfred Kohlhaufl (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-10-10 | ||||
Dieter Agatha (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-12-14 | ||||
Willi Bierofka (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-01-21 | ||||
Ahmet Glavovic (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-07-13 | ||||
Richard Mamajewski (until 1977-06-30) | 1956-02-24 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alfred Herberth (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-12-26 | ||||
Hans Haunstein (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-08-07 | ||||
Jan-Hoiland Nielsen (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-01-15 | ||||
Jimmy Hartwig (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-10-05 | ||||
Peter Falter (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-12-10 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Pelka (until 1978-06-30) | 1958-07-16 | ||||
Fritz Bischoff (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-07-03 | ||||
Alfred Riess (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-10-29 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Georg Metzger (until 1980-06-30) | 1946-11-13 | ||||
Anton Nachreiner (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-09-10 | ||||
Heinz Tochtermann (until 1977-06-30) | 1956-01-22 | ||||
Peter Scheifler (until 1977-06-30) | 1956-01-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1977-05-29 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-06-04 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-06-11 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |