Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Schafstall (until 1981-06-30) | 1937-02-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Detlef Schneider (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-10-31 | ||||
Fritz Herrndorf (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-02-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dietmar Klinger (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-01-08 | ||||
Matthias Herget (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-11-14 | ||||
Vlado Saric (until 1980-06-30) | 1945-11-27 | ||||
Eckhard Berlau-Kirschstein (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-07-05 | ||||
Detlef Wiemers (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-07-15 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Karl-Heinz Gundersdorff (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-12-25 | ||||
Jurgen Kaminsky (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-12-07 | ||||
Detlef Drescher (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-10-15 | ||||
Siegfried Bonighausen (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-03-20 | ||||
Manfred Mannebach (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-07-14 | ||||
Dieter Bartel (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-10-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jurgen Sekula (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-05-02 | ||||
Urban Klausmann (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-06-29 | ||||
Karlheinz Meininger (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-02-01 | ||||
Ente Lippens (until 1981-06-30) | 1945-11-10 | ||||
Frank Mill (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-07-23 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Diemand (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-11-05 | ||||
Frank Beyer (until 1980-06-30) | 1960-10-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1980-06-06 00:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1980-06-13 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |