Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uli Maslo (until 1983-04-23) | 1938-07-06 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1983-04-22) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernd Franke (until 1985-06-30) | 1948-02-12 | ||||
Uwe Hain (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Geiger (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-09-27 | ||||
Franz Merkhoffer (until 1984-06-30) | 1946-11-29 | ||||
Reiner Hollmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-09-30 | ||||
Hasse Borg (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-08-04 | ||||
Wolfgang Grobe (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-06-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Lars Ellmerich (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-01-02 | ||||
Matthias Bruns (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Manfred Tripbacher (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-02-23 | ||||
Reinhard Kindermann (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-03-10 | ||||
Holger Trimhold (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-06-13 | ||||
Heiner Pahl (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-02-27 | ||||
Dietmar Erler (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-04-07 | ||||
Danilo Popivoda (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-05-01 | ||||
Volker Heuschkel (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-03-28 | ||||
Jorg Klein (until 1981-06-30) | 1960-03-07 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ronnie Worm (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-10-07 | ||||
Gunter Keute (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-12-21 | ||||
Ilija Zavisic (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-01-20 | ||||
Uwe Nester (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-01-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1981-06-05 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1981-06-10 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |