Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Kurt Geinzer (from 1982-05-20) (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-07-03 | ||||
Franz Brungs (until 1982-05-19) | 1936-12-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uli Schauberger (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-12-23 | ||||
Wilfried Kohls (until 1982-06-30) | 1950-10-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gerd Paulus (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-12-31 | ||||
Michael Grunewald (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-08-29 | ||||
Michael Kutzop (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-03-24 | ||||
Wolfgang Rothe (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-10-15 | ||||
Kurt Geinzer (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-07-03 | ||||
Wolfgang Kraus (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-03-28 | ||||
Bernd Walz (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-10-15 | ||||
Claus Mensinger (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-07-31 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Hofer (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-07-21 | ||||
Gunter Franusch (until 1984-11-30) | 1959-02-27 | ||||
Franz Michelberger (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-08-28 | ||||
Uwe Bein (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-09-26 | ||||
Thomas Martin (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-01-10 | ||||
Klaus Hofmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-12-05 | ||||
Goran Blaum (until 1982-06-30) | 1961-12-05 | ||||
Hans-Peter Knecht (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-04-12 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Martin Kubosch (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-06-01 | ||||
Rudolf Sandner (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-10-25 | ||||
Walter Krause (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-05-08 | ||||
Wolfgang Trumpf (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-08-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1982-06-04 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1982-06-09 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |