Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans-Dieter Tippenhauer (from 1983-02-01) (until 1983-06-30) | 1943-10-16 | ||||
Werner Biskup (until 1983-01-31) | 1942-04-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Werner Vollack (until 1987-11-20) | 1955-03-24 | ||||
Dieter Ingendae (until 1985-12-31) | 1959-05-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Matthias Herget (until 1989-06-30) | 1955-11-14 | ||||
Werner Buttgereit (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-06-15 | ||||
Ludger van de Loo (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-03-14 | ||||
Norbert Brinkmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1952-06-16 | ||||
Peter Schwarz (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-06-14 | ||||
Michael Schuhmacher (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-08-20 | ||||
Michael van de Loo (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-06-01 | ||||
Jaime Rodriguez (until 1982-12-31) | 1959-01-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Franz Raschid (until 1988-06-30) | 1954-10-18 | ||||
Norbert Hofmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-08-14 | ||||
Sascha Jusufi (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-01-20 | ||||
Uwe Vengels (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-08-14 | ||||
Toni Puszamszies (until 1983-09-30) | 1958-08-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Horst Feilzer (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-02-21 | ||||
Peter Loontiens (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-09-16 | ||||
Christian Sackewitz (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Peter Szech (until 1983-12-31) | 1953-05-26 | ||||
Waldemar Steubing (until 1982-09-10) | 1959-11-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1983-06-15 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1983-06-19 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |