Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Saftig (from 1986-04-20) (until 1988-06-30) | 1952-01-23 | ||||
Pal Csernai (until 1986-04-20) | 1932-10-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Saftig (until 1986-04-19) | 1952-01-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rolf Meyer (until 1991-06-30) | 1955-10-03 | ||||
Eike Immel (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-11-27 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gunter Kutowski (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-08-02 | ||||
Bernd Storck (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-01-25 | ||||
Dirk Hupe (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-05-29 | ||||
Lothar Huber (until 1987-06-30) | 1952-05-05 | ||||
Andreas Hahn (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-09-06 | ||||
Ralf Loose (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-01-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Lusch (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-06-16 | ||||
Michael Zorc (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | ||||
Frank Pagelsdorf (until 1988-12-31) | 1958-02-05 | ||||
Marcel Raducanu (until 1988-06-30) | 1954-10-21 | ||||
Ingo Anderbrugge (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Uli Bittcher (until 1987-06-30) | 1957-09-10 | ||||
Meinolf Koch (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-07-12 | ||||
Wolfgang Schuler (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-02-17 | ||||
Tadeusz Krafft (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-07-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Daniel Simmes (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-08-12 | ||||
Werner Dressel (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-08-30 | ||||
Horst Hrubesch (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-04-17 | ||||
Jurgen Wegmann (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-03-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1986-05-13 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1986-05-19 19:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1986-05-30 00:00 |
8 : 0 |
Schema Compare |