Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Schlappner (until 1988-06-30) | 1940-05-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wilhelm Huxhorn (until 1993-06-30) | 1955-09-20 | ||||
Rainer Berg (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-08-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Freddy Hess (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-03-07 | ||||
Rainer Scholz (from 1987-10-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1954-09-03 | ||||
Roger Prinzen (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-03-04 | ||||
Frank Dorr (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-09-21 | ||||
Gerhard Lachmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-01-28 | ||||
Bernhard Trares (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-08-18 | ||||
Stefan Glaser (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Emig (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-06-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Martin Kowalewski (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-06-09 | ||||
Guangming Gu (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-01-31 | ||||
Volker Kispert (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-25 | ||||
Willi Bernecker (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-03-09 | ||||
Oliver Posniak (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-07-12 | ||||
Uwe Schreml (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-02-07 | ||||
Rafael Sanchez (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-06-23 | ||||
Michael Hab (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-08-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Henrik Eichenauer (from 1988-01-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-07-07 | ||||
Dieter Gutzler (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-07-28 | ||||
Uwe Kuhl (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-24 | ||||
Dieter Trunk (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-03-22 | ||||
Bodo Mattern (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-02-03 | ||||
Michael Kunast (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-02-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1988-06-02 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1988-06-05 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1988-06-09 00:00 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |