Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Felix Latzke (until 1988-11-16) | 1942-02-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gunter Sebert (until 1988-11-16) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Clauss (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-01-13 | ||||
Uwe Zimmermann (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | ||||
Valentin Herr (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-07-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Roland Dickgiesser (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Dimitrios Tsionanis (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-08-31 | ||||
Zvezdan Cvetkovic (from 1987-09-15) (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-04-18 | ||||
Manfred Bockenfeld (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-07-23 | ||||
Ulf Quaisser (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-10-12 | ||||
Dieter Finke (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-03-11 | ||||
Frank Ockert (until 1988-12-31) | 1968-11-08 | ||||
Alfred Schon (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-01-12 | ||||
Rainer Scholz (until 1987-09-30) | 1954-09-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jochen Muller (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Gunter Guttler (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-05-31 | ||||
Peter Lux (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-04 | ||||
Martin Trieb (until 1989-12-31) | 1961-09-23 | ||||
Werner Heck (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-04-21 | ||||
Jorg Neun (until 1987-11-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gerd Dais (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-08-11 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Buhrer (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-10-20 | ||||
Frank Lippmann (until 1988-12-31) | 1961-04-23 | ||||
Frank Schmoller (from 1987-09-01) (until 1988-09-15) | 1966-08-21 | ||||
Bernd Klotz (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-09-08 | ||||
Bo Elvar Jorgensen (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-02-20 | ||||
Alfred Roscher (from 1988-01-01) (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-11-11 | ||||
Henrik Eichenauer (until 1987-12-31) | 1968-07-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1988-06-02 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1988-06-05 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1988-06-09 00:00 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |