Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Manfred Gloger (until 2013-06-13) | 1962-09-14 | ||||
Michael Stahl (until 2012-06-30) | 1959-12-09 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Norbert Meier (until 2013-05-26) | 1958-09-20 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Uwe Klein (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-01-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Robert Almer (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-03-20 | |||
22 | Michael Ratajczak (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-04-16 | |||
33 | Markus Krauss (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-09-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Christian Weber (until 2012-08-30) | 1983-09-15 | |||
3 | Juanan (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-04-27 | |||
5 | Assani Lukimya (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-01-25 | |||
6 | Jens Langeneke (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-03-29 | |||
19 | Tobias Levels (from 2011-08-30) (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-11-22 | |||
21 | Johannes van den Bergh (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-11-21 | |||
24 | Jeron Al-Hazaimeh (until 2013-01-22) | 1992-02-13 | |||
31 | Kai Schwertfeger (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-09-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Karim Aouadhi (until 2011-12-31) | 1986-05-02 | |||
7 | Oliver Fink (until 2020-06-30) | 1982-06-06 | |||
8 | Sascha Dum (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-07-03 | |||
11 | Maximilian Beister (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-09-06 | |||
13 | Adam Bodzek (until 2024-06-30) | 1985-09-07 | |||
17 | Andreas Lambertz (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-10-15 | |||
23 | Robbie Kruse (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-10-05 | |||
25 | Tugrul Erat (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-06-17 | |||
26 | Jules Schwadorf (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-10-19 | |||
27 | Adam Matuschyk (from 2012-01-16) (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-02-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Ranisav Jovanovic (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-11-05 | |||
10 | Ken Ilso (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-12-02 | |||
14 | Sandor Torghelle (until 2011-08-17) | 1982-05-05 | |||
15 | Marco Konigs (until 2012-01-30) | 1990-01-25 | |||
16 | Wilijan Bischew Wilijan Bischew (from 2011-08-31) (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-01-03 | |||
18 | Thomas Broker (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-01-22 | |||
20 | Adriano Grimaldi (until 2011-12-31) | 1991-04-05 | |||
28 | Timo Furuholm (from 2012-01-10) (until 2013-01-02) | 1987-10-11 | |||
30 | Sascha Rosler (until 2012-06-30) | 1977-10-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2012-05-10 20:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-05-15 20:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |