Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Christian Fiedler (until 2013-06-30) | 1975-03-27 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Otto Rehhagel (from 2012-02-19) (until 2012-06-30) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Rene Tretschok (from 2012-02-12) (until 2012-02-19) | 1968-12-23 | ||||
Michael Skibbe (from 2012-01-01) (until 2012-02-12) | 1965-08-04 | ||||
Markus Babbel (until 2011-12-18) | 1972-09-08 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Rainer Widmayer (from 2011-12-19) (until 2011-12-21) | 1967-04-02 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ante Covic (from 2012-02-12) (until 2012-06-30) | 1975-08-31 | ||||
Rene Tretschok (from 2012-02-20) (until 2012-06-30) | 1968-12-23 | ||||
Edwin Boekamp (from 2012-01-03) (until 2012-02-12) | 1959-02-05 | ||||
Rainer Widmayer (until 2011-12-18) | 1967-04-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Maikel Aerts (until 2012-06-30) | 1976-06-26 | |||
21 | Sascha Burchert (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-10-30 | |||
34 | Richard Strebinger (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-02-14 | |||
35 | Thomas Kraft (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-07-22 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Christian Lell (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-08-29 | |||
4 | Roman Hubnik (until 2013-09-02) | 1984-06-06 | |||
5 | Andre Mijatovic (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-12-03 | |||
6 | Christoph Janker (until 2015-01-30) | 1985-02-14 | |||
7 | Maik Franz (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-08-05 | |||
14 | Sebastian Neumann (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-02-18 | |||
22 | Felix Bastians (from 2012-01-16) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-05-09 | |||
22 | Kaka (until 2011-08-30) | 1981-05-16 | |||
24 | John Anthony Brooks (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-01-28 | |||
27 | Alfredo Morales (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-05-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Lewan Kobiaschwili (until 2014-06-30) | 1977-07-10 | |||
8 | Andreas Ottl (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-03-01 | |||
10 | Raffael (until 2012-07-26) | 1985-03-28 | |||
12 | Ronny (until 2016-08-31) | 1986-05-11 | |||
17 | Anis Ben-Hatira (from 2011-08-31) (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-07-18 | |||
18 | Peter Niemeyer (until 2015-08-03) | 1983-11-22 | |||
20 | Patrick Ebert (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-03-17 | |||
23 | Fanol Perdedaj (until 2012-09-02) | 1991-07-16 | |||
26 | Nico Schulz (until 2015-08-18) | 1993-04-01 | |||
28 | Fabian Lustenberger (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-05-02 | |||
32 | Fabian Holland (from 2012-03-17) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-07-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Adrian Ramos (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-01-22 | |||
11 | Tunay Torun (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-04-21 | |||
13 | Nikita Rukavytsya (until 2012-08-30) | 1987-06-22 | |||
16 | Rob Friend (until 2011-08-30) | 1981-01-23 | |||
19 | Pierre-Michel Lasogga (until 2013-09-01) | 1991-12-15 | |||
25 | Marco Djuricin (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-12-12 | |||
33 | Abu-Bakarr Kargbo (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-12-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2012-05-10 20:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-05-15 20:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |