Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rene Weiler (until 2016-06-30) | 1973-09-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ramon Castellucci (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-03-06 | ||||
1 | Raphael Schafer (until 2017-06-30) | 1979-01-30 | |||
22 | Patrick Rakovsky (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-06-02 | |||
26 | Thorsten Kirschbaum (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-04-20 | |||
32 | Benjamin Uphoff (until 2015-08-31) | 1993-08-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Miso Brecko (from 2015-07-30) (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-05-01 | |||
3 | Even Hovland (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-02-14 | |||
4 | Davy Bulthuis (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-06-28 | |||
5 | Jurgen Mossmer (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-06-11 | |||
6 | Laszlo Sepsi (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-06-07 | |||
23 | Tim Leibold (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-11-30 | |||
28 | Lukas Muhl (from 2016-01-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-01-27 | |||
33 | Georg Margreitter (from 2015-08-24) (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-11-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Danny Blum (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-01-07 | |||
8 | Jan Polak (until 2016-06-30) | 1981-03-14 | |||
10 | Timo Gebhart (until 2016-01-30) | 1989-04-12 | |||
14 | Kevin Mohwald (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-07-03 | |||
15 | Robert Koch (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-02-26 | |||
16 | Zoltan Stieber (from 2016-01-18) (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-10-16 | |||
16 | Niklas Stark (until 2015-08-25) | 1995-04-14 | |||
17 | Sebastian Kerk (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-04-17 | |||
18 | Hanno Behrens (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-03-26 | |||
19 | Rurik Gislason (until 2018-01-17) | 1988-02-25 | |||
21 | Willi Evseev (until 2016-01-09) | 1992-02-14 | |||
27 | Philipp Hercher (until 2017-01-03) | 1996-03-21 | |||
28 | Alessandro Schopf (until 2016-01-07) | 1994-02-07 | |||
29 | Patrick Erras (until 2020-07-12) | 1995-01-21 | |||
31 | Ondrej Petrak (until 2020-01-26) | 1992-03-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Guido Burgstaller (until 2017-01-08) | 1989-04-24 | |||
11 | Jakub Sylvestr (until 2016-01-13) | 1989-02-02 | |||
20 | Stefan Kutschke (until 2016-01-07) | 1988-11-03 | |||
24 | Niclas Fullkrug (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-02-09 | |||
36 | Cedric Teuchert (until 2018-01-02) | 1997-01-14 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Stefan Kutschke (from 2016-01-08) (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-11-03 | ||||
Willi Evseev (from 2016-01-09) (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-02-14 | ||||
11 | Jakub Sylvestr (from 2016-01-13) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-02-02 | |||
33 | Tobias Pachonik (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-01-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2016-05-19 20:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2016-05-23 20:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |