Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bruno Labbadia (from 2018-02-20) (until 2019-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Martin Schmidt (from 2017-09-18) (until 2018-02-19) | 1967-04-12 | ||||
Andries Jonker (until 2017-09-18) | 1962-09-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Koen Casteels (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-06-25 | |||
20 | Max Grun (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-04-05 | |||
36 | Phillip Menzel (until 2020-07-12) | 1998-08-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Carlos Ascues (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-06-19 | ||||
Paul Jaeckel (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-07-22 | ||||
2 | William (until 2021-01-24) | 1995-04-03 | |||
3 | Paul Verhaegh (from 2017-08-07) (until 2019-04-30) | 1983-09-01 | |||
5 | Jeffrey Bruma (until 2019-01-31) | 1991-11-13 | |||
17 | Ohis Felix Uduokhai (until 2019-07-27) | 1997-09-09 | |||
24 | Sebastian Jung (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-06-22 | |||
25 | John Anthony Brooks (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-01-28 | |||
29 | Marcel Tisserand (from 2017-08-21) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-01-10 | |||
31 | Robin Knoche (until 2020-08-04) | 1992-05-22 | |||
35 | Gian-Luca Itter (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-05 | |||
40 | Robin Ziegele (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-03-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Iba May (until 2020-07-31) | 1998-06-06 | ||||
Dominik Franke (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-10-05 | ||||
4 | Camacho (until 2020-09-15) | 1990-05-04 | |||
6 | Riechedly Bazoer (until 2018-08-31) | 1996-10-12 | |||
7 | Josip Brekalo (from 2017-12-22) (until 2023-01-28) | 1998-06-23 | |||
8 | Renato Steffen (from 2018-01-10) (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-11-03 | |||
8 | Vieirinha (until 2017-08-31) | 1986-01-24 | |||
10 | Yunus Malli (until 2020-01-17) | 1992-02-24 | |||
11 | Daniel Didavi (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-02-21 | |||
13 | Yannick Gerhardt (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-03-13 | |||
15 | Christian Trasch (until 2017-08-30) | 1987-09-01 | |||
16 | Jakub Blaszczykowski (until 2019-01-03) | 1985-12-14 | |||
22 | Luiz Gustavo (until 2017-07-04) | 1987-07-23 | |||
23 | Josuha Guilavogui (until 2022-01-29) | 1990-09-19 | |||
26 | Justin Mobius (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-04-21 | |||
27 | Maximilian Arnold | 1994-05-27 | |||
30 | Paul Seguin (until 2017-08-30) | 1995-03-29 | |||
34 | Marvin Stefaniak (until 2018-01-12) | 1995-02-03 | |||
37 | Elvis Rexhbecaj (until 2020-01-06) | 1997-11-01 | |||
38 | Ismail Azzaoui (until 2017-07-31) | 1998-01-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Anton Donkor (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-11-11 | ||||
7 | Paul-Georges Ntep (until 2018-01-17) | 1992-07-29 | |||
9 | Nany Landry Dimata (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-09-01 | |||
14 | Divock Origi (from 2017-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-04-18 | |||
18 | Victor Osimhen (until 2018-08-22) | 1998-12-29 | |||
20 | Luca Horn (until 2020-09-30) | 1998-12-19 | |||
22 | Admir Mehmedi (from 2018-01-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-03-16 | |||
29 | Omar Marmoush (until 2021-01-05) | 1999-02-07 | |||
32 | Kaylen Hinds (until 2018-01-31) | 1998-01-28 | |||
33 | Mario Gomez (until 2017-12-22) | 1985-07-10 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Josip Brekalo (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-06-23 | ||||
Ismail Azzaoui (from 2017-08-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-01-06 | ||||
Paul Seguin (from 2017-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-29 | ||||
Marvin Stefaniak (from 2018-01-12) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-02-03 | ||||
Paul-Georges Ntep (from 2018-01-18) (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-07-29 | ||||
Kaylen Hinds (from 2018-01-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-01-28 | ||||
Amara Conde (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-01-06 | ||||
Carlos Ascues (until 2017-12-31) | 1992-06-19 | ||||
Anton Donkor (until 2017-12-31) | 1997-11-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2018-05-17 20:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2018-05-21 20:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |