Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Claus Boden (until 2004-06-30) | 1951-10-07 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Werner Lorant (until 2001-10-18) | 1948-11-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Pacult (until 2001-10-18) | 1959-10-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Hofmann (until 2009-06-30) | 1972-11-03 | |||
12 | Bernd Meier (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | |||
22 | Daniel Hoffmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-10-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Jochen Kientz (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-09-17 | |||
3 | Ned Zelic (until 2002-01-23) | 1971-07-04 | |||
4 | Marco Kurz (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-05-16 | |||
5 | Gerald Vanenburg (until 2000-06-30) | 1964-03-05 | |||
14 | Ronny Ernst (until 1998-11-15) | 1976-05-07 | |||
15 | Holger Greilich (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-07-12 | |||
19 | Guido Gorges (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-06-08 | |||
36 | Martin Stranzl (from 1999-05-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1980-06-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Roman Tyce (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-05-07 | |||
7 | Horst Heldt (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-12-09 | |||
8 | Michel Mazingu-Dinzey (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-10-15 | |||
10 | Abderrahim Ouakili (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-12-12 | |||
13 | Harald Cerny (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-09-13 | |||
14 | Thomas Richter (from 1998-12-01) (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-11-01 | |||
16 | Stefan Malz (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-06-15 | |||
17 | Daniel Borimirow (until 2004-01-07) | 1970-01-15 | |||
20 | Martin Cizek (from 1999-01-01) (until 2000-12-31) | 1974-06-09 | |||
20 | Miroslav Stevic (until 1998-12-31) | 1970-01-07 | |||
24 | Thomas Schluter (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-01-26 | |||
33 | Manfred Bender (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-05-24 | |||
35 | Awudu Issaka (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-06-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Olaf Bodden (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-05-04 | |||
11 | Bernhard Winkler (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-06-24 | |||
18 | Paul Agostino (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-06-09 | |||
21 | Markus Schroth (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-01-25 | |||
23 | Christo Jowow (until 1998-12-31) | 1977-11-04 | |||
34 | Bernd Hobsch (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-05-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1998-08-15 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1998-08-22 15:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1998-09-08 19:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1998-09-11 20:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1998-09-19 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1998-09-25 20:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1998-10-03 15:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1998-10-16 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-10-25 18:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1998-10-31 15:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1998-11-07 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1998-11-10 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-11-15 18:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1998-11-21 15:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1998-11-28 15:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1998-12-06 18:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1998-12-12 15:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1998-12-19 15:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-02-20 15:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-02-27 15:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-03-06 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-03-13 15:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-03-20 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-04-03 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1999-04-11 18:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1999-04-14 20:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-04-17 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1999-04-25 18:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-05-01 15:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1999-05-05 20:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-05-08 15:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-05-15 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-05-22 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-05-29 15:30 |
4 : 5 |
Schema Compare |