Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Hafner (until 1991-06-30) | 1952-02-02 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hartmut Schade (until 1991-06-03) | 1954-11-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ronny Teuber (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-09-01 | ||||
Thomas Kohler (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-06-17 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Mario Kern (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-08-16 | ||||
Detlef Schossler (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-10-03 | ||||
Hans-Uwe Pilz (from 1990-11-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1958-11-10 | ||||
Andreas Wagenhaus (until 1993-08-31) | 1964-10-29 | ||||
Steffen Buttner (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-11-02 | ||||
Frank Lieberam (until 1991-12-31) | 1962-12-17 | ||||
Andreas Diebitz (until 1990-12-31) | 1965-01-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Sven Kmetsch (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-08-13 | ||||
Sven Ratke (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-01-03 | ||||
Matthias Maucksch (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-06-11 | ||||
Ralf Hauptmann (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-09-20 | ||||
Jorg Stubner (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-07-23 | ||||
Heiko Scholz (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-01-07 | ||||
Andreas Trautmann (from 1991-01-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-05-21 | ||||
Nico Dabritz (until 1991-06-30) | 1971-08-26 | ||||
Peter Lux (until 1990-10-31) | 1962-10-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Torsten Gutschow (until 1992-12-31) | 1962-07-28 | ||||
Uwe Rosler (from 1991-01-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-11-15 | ||||
Sergio Allievi (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-01-17 | ||||
Ralf Minge (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-10-08 | ||||
Uwe Jahnig (until 1990-12-31) | 1969-08-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1990-09-19 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1990-10-03 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1990-10-24 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1990-11-07 00:00 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1991-03-06 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1991-03-20 00:00 |
0 : 3 Ab |
Schema Compare |