Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Roger Schmidt (until 2017-03-04) | 1967-03-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Markus Krosche (until 2016-06-30) | 1980-09-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bernd Leno (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-03-04 | |||
22 | David Yelldell (until 2016-06-30) | 1981-10-01 | |||
25 | Dario Kresic (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-01-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Andre Ramalho (until 2016-08-31) | 1992-02-16 | |||
3 | Kostas Stafylidis (until 2015-08-20) | 1993-12-02 | |||
4 | Jonathan Tah (from 2015-07-16) | 1996-02-11 | |||
5 | Kyriakos Papadopoulos (until 2016-08-31) | 1992-02-23 | |||
13 | Roberto Hilbert (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-10-16 | |||
16 | Tin Jedvaj (until 2019-08-20) | 1995-11-28 | |||
17 | Sebastian Boenisch (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-02-01 | |||
18 | Wendell (until 2021-08-20) | 1993-07-20 | |||
21 | Omer Toprak (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-07-21 | |||
22 | Joel Abu Hanna (from 2016-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-01-22 | |||
26 | Giulio Donati (until 2016-01-25) | 1990-02-05 | |||
33 | Lukas Boeder (until 2017-01-22) | 1997-04-18 | |||
34 | Robin Becker (until 2016-07-17) | 1997-01-18 | |||
39 | Benjamin Henrichs (until 2018-08-28) | 1997-02-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Lars Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
10 | Hakan Calhanoglu (until 2017-07-03) | 1994-02-08 | |||
19 | Julian Brandt (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-05-02 | |||
20 | Charles Aranguiz (from 2015-08-13) (until 2023-04-03) | 1989-04-17 | |||
23 | Christoph Kramer (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-02-19 | |||
35 | Wladlen Jurtschenko (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-01-22 | |||
37 | Marlon Frey (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-03-24 | |||
38 | Karim Bellarabi (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-04-08 | |||
44 | Kevin Kampl (from 2015-08-28) (until 2017-08-31) | 1990-10-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Chicharito (from 2015-08-31) (until 2017-07-23) | 1988-06-01 | |||
11 | Stefan Kiessling (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-01-25 | |||
14 | Admir Mehmedi (until 2018-01-30) | 1991-03-16 | |||
24 | Seung-Woo Ryu (until 2016-02-01) | 1993-12-17 | |||
27 | Robbie Kruse (from 2016-02-01) (until 2017-01-21) | 1988-10-05 | |||
27 | Robbie Kruse (until 2015-08-31) | 1988-10-05 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Marc Brasnic (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-10-21 | ||||
Patrik Dzalto (from 2016-01-07) (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-02-19 | ||||
Niklas Lomb (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-07-28 | ||||
Levin Oztunali (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-03-15 | ||||
Joel Pohjanpalo (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-09-13 | ||||
Malcolm Cacutalua (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-11-15 | ||||
Maximilian Wagener (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-01-03 | ||||
Seung-Woo Ryu (from 2016-02-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-12-17 | ||||
Robbie Kruse (from 2015-08-31) (until 2016-01-31) | 1988-10-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2015-09-16 20:45 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-09-29 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-10-20 20:45 |
4 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2015-11-04 20:45 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-11-24 18:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2015-12-09 20:45 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |