Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralph Hasenhuttl (until 2018-05-16) | 1967-08-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Fabio Coltorti (until 2018-06-30) | 1980-12-03 | |||
22 | Philipp Kohn (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-04-02 | |||
32 | Peter Gulacsi (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-05-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Bernardo (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-05-14 | |||
4 | Willi Orban (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-11-03 | |||
5 | Dayot Upamecano (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-10-27 | |||
6 | Ibrahima Konate (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-25 | |||
16 | Lukas Klostermann | 1996-06-03 | |||
20 | Ken Gipson (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-02-24 | |||
20 | Benno Schmitz (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-11-17 | |||
23 | Marcel Halstenberg (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-27 | |||
33 | Marvin Compper (until 2017-12-31) | 1985-06-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Elias Abouchabaka (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-03-31 | ||||
Niclas Stierlin (from 2018-01-29) (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-01-22 | ||||
Felix Beiersdorf (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-01-31) | 1998-08-01 | ||||
7 | Marcel Sabitzer (until 2021-08-30) | 1994-03-17 | |||
8 | Naby Keita (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-02-10 | |||
13 | Stefan Ilsanker (until 2020-01-31) | 1989-05-18 | |||
24 | Dominik Kaiser (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-09-16 | |||
27 | Konrad Laimer (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-05-27 | |||
31 | Diego Demme (until 2020-01-11) | 1991-11-21 | |||
44 | Kevin Kampl (from 2017-08-31) | 1990-10-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Nicolas Kuhn (until 2018-01-16) | 2000-01-01 | ||||
9 | Yussuf Poulsen | 1994-06-15 | |||
10 | Emil Forsberg (until 2023-12-31) | 1991-10-23 | |||
11 | Timo Werner (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-03-06 | |||
17 | Bruma (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-10-24 | |||
19 | Oliver Burke (until 2017-08-25) | 1997-04-07 | |||
29 | Jean-Kevin Augustin (from 2017-07-06) (until 2019-09-01) | 1997-06-16 | |||
31 | Ademola Lookman (from 2018-01-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-10-20 | |||
38 | Federico Palacios Martinez (until 2018-01-08) | 1995-04-09 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Massimo Bruno (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-09-17 | ||||
Vitaly Janelt (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-05-10 | ||||
Omer Damari (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-03-24 | ||||
Zsolt Kalmar (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-06-09 | ||||
Agyemang Diawusie (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-02-12 | ||||
Anthony Jung (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-11-03 | ||||
Marius Muller (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-07-12 | ||||
Felix Beiersdorf (from 2018-01-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-08-01 | ||||
Felix Beiersdorf (from 2017-07-11) (until 2017-12-31) | 1998-08-01 | ||||
5 | Atinc Nukan (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-07-20 | |||
28 | Yvon Mvogo (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-06-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2017-09-13 20:45 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-09-26 20:45 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-10-17 20:45 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2017-11-01 20:45 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-11-21 20:45 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2017-12-06 20:45 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |