Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Garip Capin (until 2022-06-30) | 1975-07-28 | ||||
Lars Fuchs (until 2022-06-30) | 1982-06-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marlon Sundermann (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-05-16 | |||
12 | Marco Pinkernelle (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-09-13 | |||
22 | Thomas-Marius Kuballa (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-08-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Damion Sura (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-02-21 | ||||
Lukas Dominke (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-11 | ||||
Luis Podolski (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-06-21 | ||||
2 | Stuart Ritchie (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-09-10 | |||
3 | Rene Ruther (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-22 | |||
4 | Moritz Dittmann (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-01-22 | |||
6 | Jonas Weimann (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-07-28 | |||
7 | Lawrence Ennali (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-07 | |||
8 | Louis Oppie (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-05-17 | |||
9 | Thilo Topken (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-02-27 | |||
13 | Yannik Lührs (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-09-09 | |||
13 | Ramen Cepele (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-21 | |||
14 | Frederik Truemner (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-11 | |||
16 | Eunsa Jeong (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-06 | |||
17 | Daniel Eidtner (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-06-29 | |||
22 | Pascal Fabian Kokott (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-12-07 | |||
23 | Kevin Kalinowski (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-01-22 | |||
24 | Pascal Schmedemann (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-04-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Philipp Ochs (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-04-17 | ||||
Keanu Brandt (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-17 | ||||
15 | Tim Walbrecht (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-09-18 | |||
15 | Marc Lamti (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-01-28 | |||
20 | Marin Popovic (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-08-18 | |||
21 | Jan-Erik Eichhorn (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-01-15 | |||
25 | Simon Stehle (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-09-17 | |||
25 | Marcel Rau (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-24 | |||
27 | Grace Bokake Bolufe (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-01-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Hendrik Weydandt (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-07-16 | ||||
Lennart Garlipp (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-01 | ||||
6 | Joyce Philippe Luyeye-Nkula (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-17 | |||
7 | Adem Podrimaj (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-06 | |||
9 | Nicolo Tresoldi (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-08-20 | |||
10 | Mick Gudra (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-01-01 | |||
11 | Orrin McKinze Gaines II (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-03-02 | |||
19 | Franck Evina (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-07-05 | |||
23 | Victor Gorny (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-11-17 | |||
29 | Moussa Doumbouya (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-12-12 | |||
38 | Thaddäus-Monju Momuluh (until 2024-01-03) | 2002-02-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2022-03-11 18:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-19 13:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-03-27 14:00 |
4 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-09 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-04-20 13:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-04-24 13:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-30 13:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-05-03 18:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-05-07 13:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-05-14 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |