Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Konrad Funfstuck (until 2023-06-30) | 1980-10-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Louis Lord (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-10-22 | |||
20 | Philipp Jorganovic (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-02-22 | |||
30 | Timur Pazhigov (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-12-12 | |||
35 | Ole Springer (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-11-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Tim-Justin Dietrich (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-11-08 | |||
3 | Konstantin Donalies (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-09-21 | |||
4 | Fabio Chiarodia (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-05 | |||
5 | Thomas Linkov (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-02 | |||
6 | Marc Schroder (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-12-08 | |||
7 | Pascal Hackethal (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-27 | |||
13 | Belal Halbouni (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-12-30 | |||
14 | Luke Schierenbeck (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-08 | |||
16 | Louis Poznanski (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-05-24 | |||
21 | Lasse Rosenboom (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-01-19 | |||
22 | Kyu-hyun Park (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-04-14 | |||
24 | Mikail Polat (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-06-21 | |||
31 | Yuri Backhaus (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
49 | Thore Jacobsen (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-04-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Mika-Michael Eickhoff (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-06 | |||
9 | Kristupas Keršys (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-09-06 | |||
10 | Min-woo Kim (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-03-16 | |||
14 | Marin Pudic (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-04-23 | |||
16 | Oscar Schonfelder (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-02-05 | |||
19 | Keanu Schneider (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-04-05 | |||
23 | Jascha Brandt (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-20 | |||
24 | Jakob Löpping (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-06 | |||
26 | Kaan Er (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-05-31 | |||
28 | Ilia Gruev (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-05-06 | |||
44 | Philipp Bargfrede (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-03-03 | |||
48 | Simon Straudi (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Malik Memisevic (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-05-20 | |||
10 | Davis Asante (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-04-15 | |||
11 | Philipp Kühn (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-04 | |||
11 | Willi Reincke (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-05-10 | |||
17 | Abdenego Nankishi (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-07-06 | |||
22 | Dejan Galjen (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-25 | |||
27 | Tim van de Schepop (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-03-01 | |||
29 | Nick Woltemade (until 2022-08-29) | 2002-02-14 | |||
43 | Eren Sami Dinkci (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-12-13 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Dominik Becker (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-01-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-03-13 14:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-03-20 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-09 13:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-04-13 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-04-20 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-23 14:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2022-04-29 13:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-05-07 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-05-14 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-05-21 15:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |