Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Markus Gisdol (from 2019-11-18) (until 2021-04-11) | 1969-08-17 | ||||
Achim Beierlorzer (until 2019-11-09) | 1967-11-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Timo Horn (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-05-12 | |||
18 | Thomas Kessler (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-01-20 | |||
31 | Brady Scott (until 2020-07-31) | 1999-06-30 | |||
32 | Julian Krahl (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-01-22 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Toni Leistner (from 2020-01-30) (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-08-19 | ||||
Robert Voloder (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-05-09 | ||||
2 | Benno Schmitz (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-11-17 | |||
3 | Lasse Sobiech (until 2020-01-30) | 1991-01-18 | |||
4 | Frederik Sorensen (until 2019-08-18) | 1992-04-14 | |||
5 | Rafael Czichos (until 2022-01-01) | 1990-05-14 | |||
19 | Kingsley Ehizibue (until 2022-08-29) | 1995-05-25 | |||
22 | Jorge Mere (until 2022-01-18) | 1997-04-17 | |||
23 | Jannes Horn (until 2019-08-14) | 1997-02-06 | |||
33 | Sebastiaan Bornauw (from 2019-08-06) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-03-22 | |||
34 | Noah Katterbach (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-04-13 | |||
35 | Matthias Bader (until 2020-01-31) | 1997-06-17 | |||
38 | Ismail Jakobs (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-08-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Marco Hoger (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-09-16 | |||
7 | Marcel Risse (until 2020-08-18) | 1989-12-17 | |||
8 | Birger Verstraete (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-04-16 | |||
11 | Kingsley Schindler (until 2020-08-06) | 1993-07-12 | |||
13 | Louis Schaub (until 2020-01-11) | 1994-12-29 | |||
14 | Jonas Hector (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-05-27 | |||
17 | Christian Clemens (until 2021-01-14) | 1991-08-04 | |||
20 | Elvis Rexhbecaj (from 2020-01-06) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-11-01 | |||
20 | Salih Ozcan (until 2019-08-23) | 1998-01-11 | |||
21 | Vincent Koziello (until 2020-01-31) | 1995-10-28 | |||
24 | Dominick Drexler (until 2021-07-21) | 1990-05-26 | |||
25 | Tim Lemperle (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-05 | |||
28 | Ellyes Skhiri (from 2019-07-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-05-10 | |||
30 | Florian Kainz (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-10-24 | |||
36 | Niklas Hauptmann (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-06-27 | |||
38 | Nikolas Nartey (until 2019-08-28) | 2000-02-22 | |||
39 | Darko Churlinov (until 2020-01-08) | 2000-07-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Simon Terodde (until 2020-08-04) | 1988-03-02 | |||
15 | Jhon Cordoba (until 2020-09-15) | 1993-05-11 | |||
23 | Mark Uth (from 2020-01-03) (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | |||
27 | Anthony Modeste (until 2021-01-31) | 1988-04-14 | |||
29 | Jan Thielmann (from 2019-12-01) | 2002-05-26 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Tomas Ostrak (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-02-05 | ||||
Joao Queiros (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-04-22 | ||||
Yann-Aurel Bisseck (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-11-29 | ||||
Jan-Christoph Bartels (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-13 | ||||
Jannes Horn (from 2019-08-15) (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-02-06 | ||||
Frederik Sorensen (from 2019-08-18) (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-04-14 | ||||
Salih Ozcan (from 2019-08-23) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-01-11 | ||||
Louis Schaub (from 2020-01-13) (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-12-29 | ||||
Lasse Sobiech (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-01-18 | ||||
Vincent Koziello (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-10-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2019-08-11 18:30 |
2 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-10-29 18:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |