Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Frank Schmidt | 1974-01-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Kevin Muller | 1991-03-15 | |||
22 | Vitus Eicher | 1990-11-05 | |||
22 | Vitus Eicher (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-11-05 | |||
39 | Kevin Ibrahim (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-05-26 | |||
40 | Diant Ramaj (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-09-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Marnon Busch | 1994-12-08 | |||
2 | Marnon Busch (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-12-08 | |||
5 | Oliver Husing (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-02-17 | |||
6 | Patrick Mainka | 1994-11-06 | |||
19 | Jonas Fohrenbach | 1996-01-26 | |||
19 | Jonas Fohrenbach (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-01-26 | |||
24 | Tobias Mohr (from 2020-01-10) (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-08-24 | |||
28 | Arne Feick (until 2020-07-06) | 1988-04-01 | |||
29 | Robert Strauss (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-10-07 | |||
30 | Norman Theuerkauf | 1987-01-24 | |||
31 | Jonas Brandle (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-05-06 | |||
33 | Timo Beermann (until 2020-07-06) | 1990-12-10 | |||
34 | Tobias Reithmeir (until 2019-09-02) | 1999-08-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Marc Schnatterer (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
11 | Denis Thomalla | 1992-08-16 | |||
13 | Robert Leipertz (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-02-01 | |||
16 | Kevin Sessa (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-07-06 | |||
17 | Maurice Multhaup (until 2020-07-06) | 1996-12-15 | |||
18 | Sebastian Griesbeck (until 2020-07-06) | 1990-10-03 | |||
21 | Maximilian Thiel (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-02-03 | |||
23 | Merveille Biankadi (until 2020-01-23) | 1995-05-09 | |||
27 | Konstantin Kerschbaumer (from 2019-09-02) (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-07-01 | |||
27 | Kolja Pusch (until 2019-09-02) | 1993-02-12 | |||
36 | Niklas Dorsch (until 2020-07-22) | 1998-01-15 | |||
37 | Gokalp Kilic (until 2019-09-02) | 2000-01-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Stefan Schimmer | 1994-04-28 | |||
9 | Stefan Schimmer (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-04-28 | |||
9 | Robert Glatzel (until 2019-07-31) | 1994-01-08 | |||
10 | Tim Kleindienst (from 2019-09-02) (until 2020-07-30) | 1995-08-31 | |||
11 | Denis Thomalla (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-08-16 | |||
26 | David Otto (until 2020-07-05) | 1999-03-03 | |||
32 | Patrick Schmidt (until 2021-01-20) | 1993-09-10 | |||
35 | Andrew Owusu (until 2020-07-06) | 2000-03-07 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Gokalp Kilic (from 2019-09-02) (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-01-21 | ||||
Oliver Steurer (from 2020-01-19) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-01-06 | ||||
Merveille Biankadi (from 2020-01-23) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-05-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2019-08-10 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-10-30 18:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |