Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Urs Fischer (until 2023-11-15) | 1966-02-20 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Markus Hoffmann (until 2020-06-30) | 1972-06-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Leo Oppermann (from 2019-09-04) (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-08-28 | ||||
1 | Rafal Gikiewicz (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-10-26 | |||
12 | Jakob Busk (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-09-12 | |||
35 | Moritz Nicolas (until 2020-08-04) | 1997-10-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Neven Subotic (from 2019-07-04) (until 2020-09-18) | 1988-12-10 | |||
5 | Marvin Friedrich (until 2022-01-11) | 1995-12-13 | |||
14 | Ken Reichel (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-12-19 | |||
18 | Nicolai Rapp (until 2019-12-31) | 1996-12-13 | |||
19 | Florian Hubner (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-03-01 | |||
25 | Christopher Lenz (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-09-22 | |||
28 | Christopher Trimmel | 1987-02-24 | |||
29 | Michael Parensen (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-06-24 | |||
31 | Keven Schlotterbeck (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-04-28 | |||
33 | Lennard Maloney (until 2020-08-06) | 1999-10-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Lars Dietz (until 2019-08-12) | 1997-01-07 | |||
6 | Julian Ryerson (until 2023-01-18) | 1997-11-17 | |||
7 | Akaki Gogia (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-01-18 | |||
7 | Marcel Hartel (until 2019-07-26) | 1996-01-19 | |||
8 | Joshua Mees (until 2020-10-05) | 1996-03-15 | |||
15 | Marius Bulter (from 2019-07-04) (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-03-29 | |||
17 | Florian Flecker (until 2020-08-07) | 1995-10-29 | |||
18 | Yunus Malli (from 2020-01-17) (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-02-24 | |||
21 | Grischa Promel (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-01-09 | |||
23 | Felix Kroos (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-03-12 | |||
24 | Manuel Schmiedebach (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-12-05 | |||
26 | Julius Kade (until 2020-08-06) | 1999-05-20 | |||
30 | Robert Andrich (until 2021-08-15) | 1994-09-22 | |||
34 | Christian Gentner (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-08-14 | |||
36 | Cihan Kahraman (until 2019-09-02) | 1998-10-08 | |||
40 | Maurice Opfermann-Arcones (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-06-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Sebastian Polter (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-04-01 | |||
10 | Sebastian Andersson (until 2020-09-15) | 1991-07-15 | |||
13 | Anthony Ujah (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-10-14 | |||
16 | Laurenz Dehl (until 2020-07-31) | 2001-12-12 | |||
20 | Suleiman Abdullahi (until 2020-08-04) | 1996-12-10 | |||
27 | Sheraldo Becker (until 2024-01-17) | 1995-02-09 | |||
32 | Marcus Ingvartsen (until 2021-08-30) | 1996-01-04 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Berkan Taz (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-12-19 | ||||
Lennart Moser (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-12-06 | ||||
Lars Dietz (from 2019-08-13) (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-01-07 | ||||
Nicolai Rapp (from 2020-01-01) (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-12-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2019-08-11 15:30 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-10-29 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2020-02-05 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2020-03-04 18:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |