Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fuat Kilic (until 2020-06-30) | 1973-05-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Kylian Huijnen (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-04-02 | ||||
1 | Ricco Cymer (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-09-20 | |||
1 | André Krul (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-05-08 | |||
33 | Nikolai Rehnen (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-02-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Tjorben Uphoff (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-09-08 | ||||
2 | Andre Wallenborn (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-03-25 | |||
3 | Alexander Heinze (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-12-24 | |||
5 | Patrick Salata (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-02-21 | |||
15 | Marco Muller (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-04-07 | |||
16 | Steven Rakk (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-09-16 | |||
17 | Matti Fiedler (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-12-27 | |||
19 | Robin Garnier (until 2021-01-04) | 1994-05-13 | |||
24 | Peter Hackenberg (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
26 | Matti Cebulla (from 2020-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-01-31 | |||
34 | Can Hayri Ozkan (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-12-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jeff-Denis Fehr (from 2020-02-01) (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-09-08 | ||||
Sergio Baris Gucciardo (until 2019-07-27) | 1999-04-19 | ||||
6 | David Putz (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-01-26 | |||
7 | Kai-David Bosing (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-03-07 | |||
8 | Stipe Batarilo (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-11-17 | |||
13 | Manuel Glowacz (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-09-29 | |||
21 | Sebastian Schmitt (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-07-07 | |||
22 | Muja Arifi (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-08-03 | |||
36 | Frederic Baum (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-08-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Marc Kleefisch (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-09-20 | ||||
7 | Florian Ruter (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-06-25 | |||
9 | Vincent Boesen (until 2021-01-29) | 1998-09-23 | |||
11 | David Bors (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-04-13 | |||
20 | Jonathan Benteke Lifeka (from 2019-10-18) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-04-28 | |||
37 | Gary Noel (until 2019-09-01) | 1990-03-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2019-08-10 15:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |