Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sebastian Abt (from 2020-01-02) (until 2020-08-30) | 1982-02-26 | ||||
Claus-Dieter Wollitz (until 2019-12-31) | 1965-07-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tim Stawecki (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-08-13 | |||
30 | Jan Glinker (from 2020-01-01) (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-01-18 | |||
30 | Lennart Moser (until 2020-01-21) | 1999-12-06 | |||
31 | Toni Stahl (from 2019-08-20) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-09-17 | |||
41 | Jonas Janke (until 2020-06-30) | 2002-06-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Tom Landmann (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-07-08 | ||||
2 | Florian Brugmann (from 2020-01-03) (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-01-23 | |||
3 | Marcel Hoppe (from 2019-07-10) (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-01-25 | |||
4 | Ibrahim Hajtic (from 2019-07-30) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-04-04 | |||
16 | Robert Muller (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-11-12 | |||
17 | Ben Florian Meyer (from 2019-07-08) (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-04 | |||
20 | Axel Borgmann | 1994-07-08 | |||
24 | Jan Koch (until 2022-07-30) | 1995-11-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Paul Gehrmann (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-04-28 | |||
6 | Jonas Zickert (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-08-25 | |||
10 | Felix Geisler (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-03-20 | |||
13 | Berkan Taz (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-12-19 | |||
19 | Niklas Geisler (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-12-10 | |||
21 | Tobias Eisenhuth (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-21 | |||
22 | Niclas Erlbeck (from 2019-08-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-10 | |||
25 | Dominik Pelivan (from 2020-01-30) (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-06-08 | |||
26 | Damir Bektic (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-01-30 | |||
27 | Orhan Yildirim (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-03-27 | |||
29 | Leon Schneider (until 2019-08-01) | 2000-06-19 | |||
34 | Colin Raak (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-04-21 | |||
37 | Rico Gladrow (from 2020-01-07) (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-04-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Abdulkadir Beyazit (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-11-04 | |||
8 | Dimitar Rangelow (until 2020-06-30) | 1983-02-09 | |||
14 | Tobias Hasse | 1996-01-03 | |||
23 | Felix Brugmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-11-30 | |||
33 | Moritz Broschinski (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-09-23 | |||
verliehen | |||||
16 | Arnel Kujovic (from 2020-01-02) (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-03-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2019-08-12 20:45 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |