Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Kristian Arambasic (until 2022-01-13) | 1977-08-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Hannes Frerichs (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-06-13 | |||
32 | Marco Behrens (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-12-26 | |||
33 | Jonas Horsch (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-09-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Chang-Il Park (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-01-19 | |||
4 | Nils Gocke (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-08-12 | |||
5 | Denis Nukic (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-04-21 | |||
9 | Gwan-Woo Kang (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-12-19 | |||
15 | Deniz Kolodziej (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-03-21 | |||
17 | Cedrik Hertes (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-11-27 | |||
21 | Lars Tyca (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-05-16 | |||
30 | Timo Dressler (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-10-14 | |||
31 | Claas Ole Bauer (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-06-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Tim Kreutzträger (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-10-09 | |||
10 | Ebrima Jobe (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-02-06 | |||
11 | Tom Trebin (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-09-15 | |||
13 | Ka-ram Han (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-02-09 | |||
19 | Leander Wasmus (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-05-01 | |||
22 | Daniel Block (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-09-21 | |||
26 | Boris Koweschnikow (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-06-19 | |||
27 | Nick Enghardt (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-06-20 | |||
99 | Artur Degtjarenko (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-11-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
14 | Florent Aziri (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-09-03 | |||
16 | Onur Uzun (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-03-12 | |||
23 | Amadou Sarr (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-09-22 | |||
28 | Affamefuna-Michael Ifeadigo (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-07-13 | |||
29 | Dennis Ahrens (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-10-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2019-08-11 15:30 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |