Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
David Wagner (until 2020-09-27) | 1971-10-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
23 | Markus Schubert (until 2020-09-30) | 1998-06-12 | |||
34 | Michael Langer (until 2024-06-30) | 1985-01-06 | |||
35 | Alexander Nubel (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-09-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Juan Miranda (from 2019-08-30) (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-01-19 | |||
4 | Ozan Kabak (until 2021-02-01) | 2000-03-25 | |||
5 | Matija Nastasic (until 2021-08-21) | 1993-03-28 | |||
17 | Benjamin Stambouli (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-08-13 | |||
20 | Jonjoe Kenny (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-03-15 | |||
21 | Jean-Clair Todibo (from 2020-01-15) (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-12-30 | |||
24 | Bastian Oczipka (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-01-12 | |||
26 | Salif Sane (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-08-25 | |||
27 | Jonas Carls (until 2020-01-22) | 1997-03-25 | |||
31 | Timo Becker (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-03-25 | |||
33 | Malick Thiaw (from 2020-03-07) (until 2022-08-28) | 2001-08-08 | |||
44 | George Timotheou (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-07-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jonas Hofmann (from 2020-06-01) (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-02-07 | ||||
2 | Weston McKennie (until 2020-08-30) | 1998-08-28 | |||
6 | Omar Mascarell (until 2021-08-22) | 1993-02-02 | |||
8 | Suat Serdar (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-04-11 | |||
10 | Nabil Bentaleb (until 2020-01-21) | 1994-11-24 | |||
13 | Sebastian Rudy (until 2019-07-31) | 1990-02-28 | |||
16 | Nassim Boujellab (until 2021-07-24) | 1999-06-20 | |||
18 | Daniel Caligiuri (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-01-15 | |||
25 | Amine Harit (until 2021-09-01) | 1997-06-18 | |||
28 | Alessandro Schopf (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-02-07 | |||
29 | Nicholas Taitague (until 2021-01-02) | 1999-02-17 | |||
36 | Blendi Idrizi (from 2020-01-29) (until 2022-08-29) | 1998-05-02 | |||
37 | Munir Mercan (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-12-10 | |||
40 | Can Bozdogan (until 2021-08-26) | 2001-04-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Mark Uth (until 2020-01-03) | 1991-08-24 | |||
9 | Benito Raman (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-11-07 | |||
11 | Michael Gregoritsch (from 2020-01-01) (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-04-18 | |||
11 | Jewhen Konopljanka (until 2019-09-02) | 1989-09-29 | |||
14 | Rabbi Matondo (until 2021-01-07) | 2000-09-09 | |||
15 | Ahmed Kutucu (until 2021-01-20) | 2000-03-01 | |||
19 | Guido Burgstaller (until 2020-09-30) | 1989-04-24 | |||
21 | Fabian Reese (until 2020-01-03) | 1997-11-29 | |||
22 | Steven Skrzybski (until 2020-01-03) | 1992-11-18 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Pablo Insua (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-09-09 | ||||
Bernard Tekpetey (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-09-03 | ||||
Cedric Teuchert (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-01-14 | ||||
Ralf Fahrmann (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-09-27 | ||||
Sebastian Rudy (from 2019-07-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-02-28 | ||||
Hamza Mendyl (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-10-21 | ||||
Mark Uth (from 2020-01-03) (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | ||||
Steven Skrzybski (from 2020-01-03) (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-11-18 | ||||
Nabil Bentaleb (from 2020-01-21) (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-11-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2019-08-10 15:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-10-29 20:45 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2020-02-04 20:45 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2020-03-03 20:45 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |