Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Rosler (from 2020-01-29) (until 2021-06-30) | 1968-11-15 | ||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 2020-01-29) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Axel Bellinghausen (until 2020-06-30) | 1983-05-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Maduka Okoye (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-08-28 | ||||
1 | Michael Rensing (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-05-14 | |||
12 | Jannick Theissen (until 2019-09-02) | 1998-01-07 | |||
24 | Zack Steffen (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-04-02 | |||
30 | Raphael Wolf (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-06-06 | |||
33 | Florian Kastenmeier | 1997-06-28 | |||
38 | Tim Wiesner (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-11-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Andre Hoffmann | 1993-02-28 | |||
4 | Kasim Nuhu (from 2019-08-08) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-06-22 | |||
5 | Kaan Ayhan (until 2020-08-16) | 1994-11-10 | |||
19 | Zanka (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-04-23 | |||
23 | Niko Giesselmann (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-09-26 | |||
24 | Georgios Siadas (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-12-27 | |||
25 | Matthias Zimmermann | 1992-06-16 | |||
26 | Diego Contento (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-05-01 | |||
29 | Markus Suttner (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-04-16 | |||
32 | Robin Bormuth (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-09-19 | |||
39 | Jean Zimmer (until 2021-01-11) | 1993-12-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Alfredo Morales (until 2021-04-06) | 1990-05-12 | |||
7 | Oliver Fink (until 2020-06-30) | 1982-06-06 | |||
8 | Aymen Barkok (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-05-21 | |||
10 | Valon Berisha (from 2020-01-30) (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-02-07 | |||
13 | Adam Bodzek (until 2024-06-30) | 1985-09-07 | |||
15 | Erik Thommy (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-08-20 | |||
18 | Thomas Pledl (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-05-23 | |||
19 | Davor Lovren (until 2020-01-09) | 1998-10-03 | |||
22 | Kevin Stoger (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-08-27 | |||
31 | Marcel Sobottka | 1994-04-25 | |||
34 | Lewis Baker (from 2019-07-24) (until 2020-01-22) | 1995-04-25 | |||
37 | Bernard Tekpetey (until 2020-07-30) | 1997-09-03 | |||
40 | Johannes Buhler (until 2021-02-23) | 1997-07-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Nana Ampomah (from 2019-07-11) (until 2020-10-04) | 1996-01-02 | ||||
9 | Dawid Kownacki (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-03-14 | |||
11 | Kenan Karaman (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-03-05 | |||
14 | Kelvin Ofori (from 2019-08-06) (until 2021-08-10) | 2001-07-27 | |||
16 | Havard Nielsen (until 2019-07-26) | 1993-07-15 | |||
20 | Steven Skrzybski (from 2020-01-03) (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-11-18 | |||
21 | Emir Kujovic (until 2019-08-12) | 1988-06-22 | |||
28 | Rouwen Hennings (until 2023-06-30) | 1987-08-28 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Emmanuel Iyoha (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-10-11 | ||||
Gokhan Gul (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-07-17 | ||||
Jannick Theissen (from 2019-09-02) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-01-07 | ||||
Davor Lovren (from 2020-01-09) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-10-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2019-08-10 15:30 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-10-30 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2020-02-04 18:30 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2020-03-03 18:30 |
7 : 6 PSO |
Schema Compare |