Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bruno Labbadia (from 2020-04-09) (until 2021-01-23) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Jurgen Klinsmann (from 2019-11-27) (until 2020-02-11) | 1964-07-30 | ||||
Ante Covic (until 2019-11-27) | 1975-08-31 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Alexander Nouri (from 2020-02-11) (until 2020-04-08) | 1979-08-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Luis Klatte (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-03-01 | ||||
1 | Thomas Kraft (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-07-22 | |||
12 | Dennis Smarsch (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-14 | |||
22 | Rune Jarstein (until 2023-06-30) | 1984-09-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Peter Pekarik (until 2024-06-30) | 1986-10-30 | |||
4 | Karim Rekik (until 2020-10-04) | 1994-12-02 | |||
5 | Niklas Stark (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-04-14 | |||
13 | Lukas Klunter (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-05-26 | |||
17 | Maximilian Mittelstadt (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-18 | |||
20 | Dedryck Boyata (until 2022-08-22) | 1990-11-28 | |||
21 | Marvin Plattenhardt (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-26 | |||
25 | Jordan Torunarigha (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-08-07 | |||
29 | Florian Baak (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-03-18 | |||
32 | Luca Netz (until 2021-08-05) | 2003-05-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Kevin Sessa | 2000-07-06 | ||||
3 | Per Skjelbred (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-06-16 | |||
6 | Vladimir Darida (until 2022-12-30) | 1990-08-08 | |||
7 | Eduard Lowen (until 2020-01-05) | 1997-01-28 | |||
10 | Ondrej Duda (until 2020-01-12) | 1994-12-15 | |||
11 | Mathew Leckie (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-02-04 | |||
15 | Marko Grujic (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-04-13 | |||
16 | Javairo Dilrosun (until 2021-08-31) | 1998-06-22 | |||
18 | Santiago Ascacibar (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-02-25 | |||
23 | Arne Maier (until 2020-10-05) | 1999-01-08 | |||
26 | Sidney Friede (until 2019-12-31) | 1998-04-12 | |||
30 | Marius Wolf (from 2019-09-02) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-05-27 | |||
34 | Maurice Covic (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-04-17 | |||
39 | Julian Albrecht (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-08-31 | |||
40 | Lazar Samardzic (until 2020-09-07) | 2002-02-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Maximilian Pronichev (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-11-17 | ||||
7 | Krzysztof Piatek (from 2020-01-30) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-07-01 | |||
8 | Salomon Kalou (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-08-05 | |||
9 | Alexander Esswein (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-03-25 | |||
14 | Pascal Kopke (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-09-03 | |||
19 | Vedad Ibisevic (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-08-06 | |||
24 | Palko Dardai (until 2021-01-05) | 1999-04-24 | |||
26 | Matheus Cunha (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-05-27 | |||
27 | Davie Selke (until 2020-01-31) | 1995-01-20 | |||
28 | Dodi Lukebakio (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-09-24 | |||
32 | Dennis Jastrzembski (until 2020-01-30) | 2000-02-20 | |||
33 | Daishawn Redan (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-02-02 | |||
33 | Jessic Ngankam (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-07-20 | |||
36 | Muhammed Kiprit (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-07-09 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Davie Selke (from 2020-01-31) (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-01-20 | ||||
Dennis Jastrzembski (from 2020-01-31) (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-02-20 | ||||
Eduard Lowen (from 2020-01-05) (until 2020-10-05) | 1997-01-28 | ||||
Ondrej Duda (from 2020-01-13) (until 2020-07-30) | 1994-12-15 | ||||
Nils Korber (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-11-13 | ||||
Lucas Tousart (from 2020-01-27) (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-04-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2019-08-11 15:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-10-30 20:45 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2020-02-04 20:45 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |