Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Markus Miller (until 2020-06-30) | 1982-04-08 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Christian Eichner (from 2020-02-03) (until 2020-06-30) | 1982-11-24 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dimitrios Moutas (from 2020-02-04) (until 2020-06-30) | 1968-04-15 | ||||
Alois Schwartz (until 2020-02-03) | 1967-03-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Benjamin Uphoff (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-08-08 | |||
28 | Sven Muller (until 2020-09-08) | 1996-02-16 | |||
29 | Mario Schragl (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-31 | |||
35 | Marius Gersbeck (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-06-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Daniel Gordon (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
5 | David Pisot (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-07-06 | |||
6 | Damian Rossbach (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-02-27 | |||
21 | Marco Thiede (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-05-20 | |||
22 | Christoph Kobald (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-08-18 | |||
22 | Christoph Kobald (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-08-18 | |||
23 | Dirk Carlson (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-04-01 | |||
27 | Marlon Dinger (until 2020-09-30) | 2001-06-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Anis Ben-Hatira (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-07-18 | ||||
Alexander Siebeck (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-11-03 | ||||
2 | Burak Camoglu (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-10-05 | |||
4 | Lukas Frode (until 2021-08-30) | 1995-01-23 | |||
7 | Marc Lorenz (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-07-18 | |||
8 | Manuel Stiefler (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-07-25 | |||
10 | Marvin Wanitzek (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-05-07 | |||
11 | Martin Roser (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-08-13 | |||
18 | Justin Mobius (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-04-21 | |||
20 | Alexander Groiss (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-07-01 | |||
23 | Sercan Sararer (until 2019-07-01) | 1989-11-27 | |||
25 | Janis Hanek (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-02-12 | |||
26 | Jerome Gondorf (from 2020-01-15) (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-06-26 | |||
27 | Lukas Grozurek (from 2019-07-07) (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-12-22 | |||
37 | Kyoung Rok Choi (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-03-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Marvin Pourie (until 2020-01-21) | 1991-01-08 | |||
14 | Saliou Sane (until 2020-01-31) | 1992-07-19 | |||
17 | Marco Djuricin (until 2021-01-31) | 1992-12-12 | |||
19 | Dominik Kother (until 2022-01-30) | 2000-03-16 | |||
20 | Valentino Vujinovic (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-02-20 | |||
24 | Babacar Gueye (from 2020-01-30) (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-12-31 | |||
30 | Anton Fink (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-07-31 | |||
31 | Malik Batmaz (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-03-17 | |||
33 | Philipp Hofmann (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-03-30 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Marvin Pourie (from 2020-01-21) (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-01-08 | ||||
Tim Kircher (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-03-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2019-08-12 18:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-10-29 20:45 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2020-02-05 20:45 |
5 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |