Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Kramer (from 2020-03-10) (until 2021-04-13) | 1967-03-23 | ||||
Daniel Steuernagel (from 2019-10-16) (until 2020-03-09) | 1979-11-16 | ||||
Heiko Vogel (until 2019-09-25) | 1975-11-21 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Stefan Reisinger (from 2019-09-25) (until 2019-10-16) | 1981-09-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Stefan Reisinger (from 2019-10-16) (until 2020-06-30) | 1981-09-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lukas Konigshofer (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-03-16 | |||
1 | Rene Vollath (until 2020-07-05) | 1990-03-20 | |||
27 | Robin Udegbe (until 2020-07-21) | 1991-03-20 | |||
33 | Philipp Bachmeier (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-04-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Edvinas Girdvainis (from 2020-01-09) (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-01-17 | |||
2 | Andreas Maxso (until 2019-09-02) | 1994-03-18 | |||
4 | Jan Kirchhoff (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-10-01 | |||
5 | Assani Lukimya (until 2021-07-05) | 1986-01-25 | |||
6 | Kevin Grosskreutz (until 2020-10-03) | 1988-07-19 | |||
7 | Christian Dorda (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-12-06 | |||
12 | Hakim Guenouche (until 2020-07-15) | 2000-05-30 | |||
15 | Alexander Bittroff (until 2020-07-05) | 1988-09-19 | |||
24 | Oliver Steurer (until 2020-01-19) | 1995-01-06 | |||
32 | Dominic Maroh (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-03-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Selim Gunduz (until 2020-07-05) | 1994-05-16 | |||
8 | Christian Kinsombi (until 2020-07-31) | 1999-08-24 | |||
10 | Patrick Pflucke (until 2020-08-04) | 1996-11-30 | |||
11 | Roberto Rodriguez (until 2020-07-05) | 1990-07-28 | |||
13 | Stefan Aigner (until 2019-09-01) | 1987-08-20 | |||
14 | Necirwan Khalil Mohammad (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-05-05 | |||
21 | Jean-Manuel Mbom (until 2020-07-04) | 2000-02-24 | |||
28 | Manuel Konrad (until 2020-10-04) | 1988-04-14 | |||
30 | Dennis Daube (until 2020-07-05) | 1989-07-11 | |||
31 | Adam Matuschyk (until 2020-07-05) | 1989-02-14 | |||
36 | Rijad Kobiljar (from 2020-01-21) (until 2020-07-05) | 1996-04-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Tom Boere (from 2019-09-02) (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-11-24 | |||
9 | Maximilian Beister (until 2019-07-10) | 1990-09-06 | |||
18 | Franck Evina (until 2020-07-05) | 2000-07-05 | |||
19 | Adriano Grimaldi (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-04-05 | |||
20 | Ali Ibrahimaj (until 2021-01-27) | 1991-08-18 | |||
23 | Boubacar Barry (until 2020-07-05) | 1996-04-15 | |||
23 | Tobias Ruhle (until 2020-01-30) | 1991-02-07 | |||
35 | Osayamen Osawe (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-09-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2019-08-09 20:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |