Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Julian Nagelsmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-07-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Peter Gulacsi | 1990-05-06 | |||
33 | Philipp Tschauner (from 2019-07-30) (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-11-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Angelino (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-08-30) | 1997-01-04 | |||
3 | Marcelo Saracchi (until 2020-01-06) | 1998-04-23 | |||
4 | Willi Orban (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-11-03 | |||
5 | Dayot Upamecano (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-10-27 | |||
6 | Ibrahima Konate (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-25 | |||
12 | Malik Talabidi (until 2020-08-25) | 2001-07-16 | |||
16 | Lukas Klostermann | 1996-06-03 | |||
22 | Nordi Mukiele (until 2022-07-25) | 1997-11-01 | |||
23 | Marcel Halstenberg (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-27 | |||
26 | Ethan Ampadu (from 2019-07-22) (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-09-14 | |||
36 | Luan Candido (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-02-02 | |||
37 | Frederik Jakel (until 2020-07-14) | 2001-03-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Niclas Stierlin (until 2019-07-18) | 2000-01-22 | ||||
7 | Marcel Sabitzer (until 2021-08-30) | 1994-03-17 | |||
8 | Amadou Haidara | 1998-01-31 | |||
13 | Stefan Ilsanker (until 2020-01-31) | 1989-05-18 | |||
14 | Tyler Adams (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-02-14 | |||
17 | Ademola Lookman (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-10-20 | |||
18 | Christopher Nkunku (from 2019-07-18) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-14 | |||
19 | Hannes Wolf (until 2020-07-21) | 1999-04-16 | |||
25 | Dani Olmo (from 2020-01-25) (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-05-07 | |||
27 | Konrad Laimer (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-05-27 | |||
31 | Diego Demme (until 2020-01-11) | 1991-11-21 | |||
44 | Kevin Kampl | 1990-10-09 | |||
53 | Tom Krauss (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-06-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Elias Abouchabaka (from 2020-01-17) (until 2020-01-31) | 2000-03-31 | ||||
9 | Yussuf Poulsen | 1994-06-15 | |||
10 | Emil Forsberg (until 2023-12-31) | 1991-10-23 | |||
11 | Timo Werner (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-03-06 | |||
20 | Matheus Cunha (until 2020-01-31) | 1999-05-27 | |||
21 | Patrik Schick (from 2019-09-02) (until 2020-08-31) | 1996-01-24 | |||
29 | Jean-Kevin Augustin (until 2019-09-01) | 1997-06-16 | |||
35 | Fabrice Hartmann (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-03-02 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Marcelo Saracchi (from 2020-01-06) (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-04-23 | ||||
Jean-Kevin Augustin (from 2019-09-01) (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-06-16 | ||||
Elias Abouchabaka (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-03-31 | ||||
28 | Yvon Mvogo (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-06-06 | |||
36 | Luan Candido (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-02-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2019-08-11 15:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-10-30 18:30 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2020-02-04 18:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |