Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Leitl (until 2022-06-30) | 1977-08-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marius Funk (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-01-01 | |||
25 | Leon Schaffran (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-07-31 | |||
30 | Sascha Burchert (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-10-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Felix Beijmo (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-01-31 | ||||
3 | Maximilian Wittek (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-08-21 | |||
5 | Mergim Mavraj (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-06-09 | |||
13 | Marco Caligiuri (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-04-14 | |||
18 | Marco Meyerhofer | 1995-11-18 | |||
23 | Paul Jaeckel (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-07-22 | |||
24 | Maximilian Sauer (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-05-15 | |||
29 | Tobias Mohr (until 2020-01-10) | 1995-08-24 | |||
36 | Alexander Lungwitz (until 2020-09-21) | 2000-08-04 | |||
38 | Maximilian Bauer (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-02-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Malik McLemore (from 2020-03-01) (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-01-16 | ||||
9 | Shawn Parker (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-03-07 | |||
11 | David Raum (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-04-22 | |||
14 | Hans Nunoo Sarpei (until 2021-12-31) | 1998-08-22 | |||
15 | Sebastian Ernst (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-03-04 | |||
21 | Timothy Tillman (from 2020-01-03) (until 2023-02-10) | 1999-01-04 | |||
21 | Nik Omladic (until 2019-08-28) | 1989-08-21 | |||
27 | Kenny Redondo (until 2020-10-05) | 1994-08-29 | |||
31 | Daniel Steininger (until 2020-01-17) | 1995-04-13 | |||
33 | Paul Seguin (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-03-29 | |||
34 | Marvin Stefaniak (until 2020-10-04) | 1995-02-03 | |||
37 | Julian Green | 1995-06-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Mert-Yusuf Torlak (until 2020-06-30) | 2002-07-18 | ||||
7 | Robin Kehr (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-02-22 | |||
8 | Elias Abouchabaka (until 2020-01-17) | 2000-03-31 | |||
10 | Daniel Keita-Ruel (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-09-21 | |||
16 | Havard Nielsen (from 2019-07-26) (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-07-15 | |||
17 | Branimir Hrgota (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-01-12 | |||
19 | Benedikt Zahn (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-02-24 | |||
40 | Jamie Leweling (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-02-26 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Patrick Sontheimer (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-07-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2019-08-11 18:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |