Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Enrico Maassen (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-03-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jan Schonwalder (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-02-12 | |||
30 | Niclas Heimann (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-03-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Calvin Brackelmann (from 2020-01-23) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-08-22 | ||||
3 | Daniel Flottmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1984-08-06 | |||
6 | Fynn Arkenberg (from 2019-08-13) (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-03-04 | |||
18 | Henrik Winkelmann (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-04-05 | |||
19 | Nico Knystock (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-10-19 | |||
22 | Julian Wolff (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-03-30 | |||
23 | Omar Traore (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-02-04 | |||
24 | Nikola Serra (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-01-05 | |||
27 | Kevin Harder (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-08-12 | |||
28 | Laurin von Piechowski (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-02-22 | |||
33 | Angelo Langer (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-05-12 | |||
37 | Mirko Schuster (from 2020-01-31) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-07-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Felix Backszat (until 2020-05-08) | 1989-09-13 | |||
7 | Nico Buckmaier (from 2020-01-22) (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-11-09 | |||
8 | Eros Dacaj (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-09-09 | |||
11 | Patrick Kurzen (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-12-28 | |||
17 | Christian Derflinger (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-02-02 | |||
29 | Lukas Kunze (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-06-14 | |||
32 | Franz Pfanne (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-12-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Tobias Steffen (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-06-03 | |||
9 | Simon Engelmann (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-03-22 | |||
13 | Lars Lokotsch (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-05-17 | |||
16 | Bjorn Schlottke (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-05-22 | |||
21 | Nico Empen (until 2020-01-24) | 1996-01-11 | |||
39 | Joy Slayd Mickels (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-03-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2019-08-11 15:30 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |