Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernhard Trares (until 2020-07-05) | 1965-08-18 | ||||
Teammanager | |||||
Jochen Kientz (until 2021-06-30) | 1972-09-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Timo Konigsmann (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-04-05 | |||
24 | Miro Varvodic (until 2020-07-05) | 1989-05-15 | |||
25 | Markus Scholz (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-05-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Mete Celik (until 2020-07-05) | 1996-10-08 | |||
4 | Kevin Conrad (until 2020-07-05) | 1990-08-10 | |||
5 | Marcel Seegert | 1994-04-29 | |||
22 | Jan Just (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-09-14 | |||
23 | Michael Schultz (until 2020-07-05) | 1993-05-30 | |||
26 | Jan-Hendrik Marx (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-04-26 | |||
26 | Florian Flick (until 2020-07-05) | 2000-05-01 | |||
27 | Gerrit Gohlke (from 2020-01-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-12 | |||
29 | Anthony Loviso (until 2020-07-05) | 1991-03-24 | |||
31 | Marcel Hofrath (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-03-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Sandro Loechelt (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-08-24 | ||||
6 | Marco Schuster (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-10-10 | |||
7 | Raffael Korte (until 2020-07-05) | 1990-08-29 | |||
8 | Dorian Diring (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-04-11 | |||
10 | Arianit Ferati (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-09-07 | |||
13 | Max Christiansen (from 2019-07-26) (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-09-25 | |||
15 | Silas Schwarz (until 2020-07-05) | 1997-11-08 | |||
17 | Gianluca Korte (until 2020-07-05) | 1990-08-29 | |||
18 | Mohamed Gouaida (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-05-15 | |||
21 | Benedict Dos Santos (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-05-02 | |||
27 | Sinisa Sprecakovic (until 2020-07-05) | 1998-08-16 | |||
28 | Jonas Weik (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-03-31 | |||
33 | Dennis Franzin (until 2020-07-05) | 1993-07-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Andis Shala (from 2020-01-01) (until 2020-10-04) | 1988-11-15 | ||||
9 | Valmir Sulejmani (until 2020-07-05) | 1996-02-01 | |||
11 | Jesse Weissenfels (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-05-26 | |||
14 | Maurice Deville (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-07-31 | |||
19 | Mounir Bouziane (until 2020-07-05) | 1991-02-05 | |||
30 | Jean Koffi (until 2020-07-05) | 1986-06-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2019-08-11 15:30 |
3 : 5 |
Schema Compare |