Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alfred Schreuder (until 2020-06-09) | 1972-11-02 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Matthias Kaltenbach (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-03-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Baumann | 1990-06-02 | |||
12 | Philipp Pentke (until 2023-06-30) | 1985-05-01 | |||
28 | Michael Esser (from 2020-01-14) (until 2020-07-29) | 1987-11-22 | |||
33 | Alexander Stolz (until 2020-06-30) | 1983-10-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Joshua Brenet (until 2020-01-31) | 1994-03-20 | |||
3 | Pavel Kaderabek | 1992-04-25 | |||
3 | Pavel Kaderabek (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-04-25 | |||
4 | Ermin Bicakcic (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-01-24 | |||
5 | Kostas Stafylidis (until 2021-07-31) | 1993-12-02 | |||
15 | Kasim Nuhu (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-06-22 | |||
21 | Benjamin Hubner (until 2022-12-06) | 1989-07-04 | |||
22 | Kevin Vogt (until 2024-01-11) | 1991-09-23 | |||
22 | Kevin Vogt (until 2020-01-12) | 1991-09-23 | |||
24 | Justin Hoogma (until 2019-07-29) | 1998-06-11 | |||
25 | Kevin Akpoguma | 1995-04-19 | |||
31 | Lucas Ribeiro (until 2020-09-18) | 1999-01-19 | |||
32 | Melayro Bogarde (until 2022-01-14) | 2002-05-28 | |||
38 | Stefan Posch (until 2022-08-31) | 1997-05-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ilay Elmkies (until 2020-09-18) | 2000-03-10 | ||||
6 | Havard Nordtveit (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-06-21 | |||
7 | Lukas Rupp (until 2020-01-13) | 1991-01-08 | |||
8 | Dennis Geiger | 1998-06-10 | |||
8 | Dennis Geiger (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-06-10 | |||
11 | Florian Grillitsch (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-08-07 | |||
13 | Leonardo Bittencourt (until 2019-09-02) | 1993-12-19 | |||
16 | Sebastian Rudy (from 2019-07-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-02-28 | |||
17 | Steven Zuber (until 2020-08-04) | 1991-08-17 | |||
18 | Diadie Samassekou (from 2019-08-15) (until 2024-02-01) | 1996-01-11 | |||
18 | Diadie Samassekou (from 2019-08-15) (until 2022-09-16) | 1996-01-11 | |||
18 | Nadiem Amiri (until 2019-07-30) | 1996-10-27 | |||
20 | Robert Zulj (until 2020-01-15) | 1992-02-05 | |||
30 | Philipp Ochs (until 2020-01-31) | 1997-04-17 | |||
42 | Christoph Baumgartner (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-08-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Bruno Nazario (from 2020-01-01) (until 2020-01-17) | 1995-02-09 | ||||
7 | Jacob Bruun Larsen (from 2020-01-31) (until 2021-01-22) | 1998-09-19 | |||
9 | Ihlas Bebou | 1994-04-23 | |||
9 | Ihlas Bebou (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-04-23 | |||
10 | Munas Dabbur (from 2020-01-07) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-05-14 | |||
19 | Ishak Belfodil (until 2021-08-22) | 1992-01-12 | |||
23 | Sargis Adamjan (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-05-23 | |||
27 | Andrej Kramaric | 1991-06-19 | |||
29 | Robert Skov (from 2019-07-27) (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-05-20 | |||
32 | Vincenzo Grifo (until 2019-09-02) | 1993-04-07 | |||
34 | Joelinton (until 2019-07-22) | 1996-08-14 | |||
35 | Maximilian Beier (from 2020-01-01) (until 2021-08-18) | 2002-10-17 | |||
37 | Jurgen Locadia (from 2019-08-29) (until 2020-01-31) | 1993-11-07 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Franko Kovačević (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-08-08 | ||||
David Otto (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-03-03 | ||||
Justin Hoogma (from 2019-07-30) (until 2022-01-23) | 1998-06-11 | ||||
Jacob Bruun Larsen (from 2020-01-23) (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-09-19 | ||||
Bruno Nazario (from 2020-01-17) (until 2020-12-31) | 1995-02-09 | ||||
Alfons Amade (until 2020-07-12) | 1999-11-12 | ||||
Leonardo Bittencourt (from 2019-09-02) (until 2020-07-06) | 1993-12-19 | ||||
Kevin Vogt (from 2020-01-13) (until 2020-07-06) | 1991-09-23 | ||||
Gregor Kobel (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-12-06 | ||||
Meris Skenderovic (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-03-28 | ||||
Felipe Pires (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-04-18 | ||||
Joshua Brenet (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-03-20 | ||||
Bruno Nazario (until 2019-12-31) | 1995-02-09 | ||||
15 | Kasim Nuhu (from 2019-08-08) (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-06-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2019-08-10 18:30 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-10-29 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2020-02-05 20:45 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |