Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Markus Mattes (until 2023-06-30) | 1975-07-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Felix Junghan (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-09-04 | |||
21 | Florian Rauh (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-02-04 | |||
31 | Daniel Baltzer (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-10-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Ralf Schroder (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-08-04 | |||
5 | Benjamin Schmidramsl (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-07-29 | |||
8 | Dominik Wolfsteiner (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-03-12 | |||
11 | Sebastian Grassl (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-07-06 | |||
17 | Markus Waffler (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-09-17 | |||
23 | Florian Lamprecht (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-01-23 | |||
36 | Jakob Zitzelsberger (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-01-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Lucas Schraufstetter (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-01-02 | |||
9 | Fabian Neumayer (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-04-08 | |||
14 | Ismailcan Usta (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-04-22 | |||
16 | Philipp Federl (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-10-24 | |||
18 | Niklas Reutelhuber (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-02-20 | |||
19 | Adrian Istrefi (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-03-14 | |||
20 | Christian Heinloth (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-07-13 | |||
22 | Jonas Fries (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-01-03 | |||
27 | Julian Kugel (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-30 | |||
80 | Marcel Schelle (from 2020-02-01) (until 2020-08-09) | 1997-07-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
6 | Arjon Kryeziu (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-06-24 | |||
10 | Fabian Eberle (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-10-18 | |||
14 | Marcel Jasmann (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-05-15 | |||
28 | Atdhedon Lushi (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-01-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2019-08-11 15:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |