Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Greiber (until 2020-06-30) | 1968-10-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Reis (from 2019-09-06) (until 2022-09-12) | 1973-10-04 | ||||
Heiko Butscher (from 2019-09-02) (until 2019-09-05) | 1980-07-28 | ||||
Robin Dutt (until 2019-08-26) | 1965-01-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Manuel Riemann (until 2024-06-30) | 1988-09-09 | |||
25 | Patrick Drewes (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-02-04 | |||
40 | Paul Grave (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-04-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Cristian Gamboa (from 2019-08-27) | 1989-10-24 | |||
3 | Danilo Soares (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-10-29 | |||
4 | Simon Lorenz (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-03-30 | |||
5 | Saulo Decarli (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-02-04 | |||
6 | Jordi Osei-Tutu (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-10-02 | |||
15 | Maxwell Gyamfi (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-01-18 | |||
19 | Patrick Fabian (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-10-11 | |||
21 | Stefano Celozzi (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-11-02 | |||
22 | Dominik Baumgartner (until 2019-09-02) | 1996-07-20 | |||
24 | Vassilios Lambropoulos (from 2020-01-31) (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-03-31 | |||
29 | Maxim Leitsch (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-05-18 | |||
37 | Armel Bella Kotchap (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-12-11 | |||
38 | Stylianos Kokovas (until 2021-01-11) | 2001-07-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Lars Holtkamp (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-11-21 | ||||
2 | Tim Hoogland (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-06-11 | |||
7 | Sebastian Maier (until 2021-01-20) | 1993-09-18 | |||
8 | Anthony Losilla | 1986-03-10 | |||
10 | Thomas Eisfeld (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-01-18 | |||
11 | Chung-Yong Lee (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-07-02 | |||
17 | Danny Blum (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-01-07 | |||
20 | Vitaly Janelt (until 2020-10-03) | 1998-05-10 | |||
23 | Robert Tesche (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-05-27 | |||
26 | Gorkem Saglam (until 2020-01-20) | 1998-04-11 | |||
28 | Ulrich Bapoh (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-06-29 | |||
32 | Robert Zulj (from 2020-01-15) (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-02-05 | |||
36 | Jan Wellers (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-02-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Manuel Wintzheimer (from 2019-09-02) (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-10 | ||||
9 | Simon Zoller (until 2023-09-01) | 1991-06-26 | |||
14 | Tom Weilandt (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-04-27 | |||
27 | Milos Pantovic (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-07-07 | |||
33 | Moritz Romling (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-04-30 | |||
35 | Silvere Ganvoula (until 2022-01-25) | 1996-06-22 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Dominik Baumgartner (from 2019-09-02) (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-07-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2019-08-10 18:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-10-29 20:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |