Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Florian Kohfeldt (until 2021-05-15) | 1982-10-05 | ||||
Teammanager | |||||
Tim Barten (until 2021-06-30) | 1976-08-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Michael Zetterer (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-07-12 | ||||
1 | Jiri Pavlenka (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-04-14 | |||
1 | Jiri Pavlenka (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-04-14 | |||
27 | Stefanos Kapino (until 2021-01-20) | 1994-03-18 | |||
40 | Luca Plogmann (until 2020-08-04) | 2000-03-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Robert Bauer (until 2019-08-21) | 1995-04-09 | ||||
2 | Felix Beijmo (until 2019-08-12) | 1998-01-31 | |||
3 | Kevin Vogt (from 2020-01-13) (until 2020-07-06) | 1991-09-23 | |||
4 | Michael Lang (from 2019-08-29) (until 2020-07-06) | 1991-02-08 | |||
5 | Ludwig Augustinsson (until 2021-08-30) | 1994-04-21 | |||
13 | Milos Veljkovic | 1995-09-26 | |||
13 | Milos Veljkovic (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-26 | |||
15 | Sebastian Langkamp (until 2020-07-06) | 1988-01-15 | |||
18 | Niklas Moisander (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-09-29 | |||
21 | Omer Toprak (from 2019-08-10) (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-07-21 | |||
23 | Theodor Gebre Selassie (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-12-24 | |||
32 | Marco Friedl | 1998-03-16 | |||
32 | Marco Friedl (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-03-16 | |||
36 | Christian Gross (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-02-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Kevin Mohwald (until 2021-08-30) | 1993-07-03 | |||
10 | Leonardo Bittencourt (from 2019-09-02) | 1993-12-19 | |||
17 | Nuri Sahin (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-09-05 | |||
22 | Fin Bartels (until 2020-07-06) | 1987-02-07 | |||
24 | Johannes Eggestein (until 2020-10-05) | 1998-05-08 | |||
26 | Simon Straudi (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-27 | |||
28 | Ilia Gruev (until 2023-08-31) | 2000-05-06 | |||
28 | Ilia Gruev (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-05-06 | |||
30 | Davy Klaassen (until 2020-10-05) | 1993-02-21 | |||
31 | David Lennart Philipp (until 2020-09-14) | 2000-04-10 | |||
34 | Jean-Manuel Mbom (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-02-24 | |||
35 | Maximilian Eggestein (until 2021-08-17) | 1996-12-08 | |||
39 | Benjamin Goller (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-01 | |||
44 | Philipp Bargfrede (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-03-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Milot Rashica (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-06-28 | |||
8 | Yuya Osako (until 2021-08-07) | 1990-05-18 | |||
9 | Martin Harnik (until 2019-09-02) | 1987-06-10 | |||
11 | Niclas Fullkrug (until 2023-08-31) | 1993-02-09 | |||
11 | Niclas Fullkrug (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-02-09 | |||
14 | Claudio Pizarro (until 2020-07-06) | 1978-10-03 | |||
19 | Joshua Sargent (until 2021-08-09) | 2000-02-20 | |||
27 | Davie Selke (from 2020-01-31) (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-01-20 | |||
36 | Luc Ihorst (until 2020-08-03) | 2000-03-07 | |||
41 | Nick Woltemade (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-02-14 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Niklas Schmidt (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-03-01 | ||||
Jonah Osabutey (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-10-08 | ||||
Jean-Manuel Mbom (until 2020-07-04) | 2000-02-24 | ||||
Michael Zetterer (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-07-12 | ||||
Thore Jacobsen (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-04-19 | ||||
Jan-Niklas Beste (from 2019-07-04) (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-04 | ||||
Felix Beijmo (from 2019-08-13) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-01-31 | ||||
Martin Harnik (from 2019-09-02) (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-06-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2019-08-10 20:45 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-10-30 18:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2020-02-04 20:45 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2020-03-04 20:45 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |