Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christian Titz (from 2021-02-12) (until 2023-06-30) | 1971-04-01 | ||||
Matthias Mincu (from 2021-02-09) (until 2021-02-11) | 1992-08-14 | ||||
Thomas Hossmang (until 2021-02-09) | 1966-11-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Morten Behrens (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-04-01 | |||
1 | Alexander Brunst-Zollner (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-07-07 | |||
12 | Tom Schlitter (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-05-17 | |||
30 | Timon Weiner (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-01-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Leon Schmokel (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-06-09 | ||||
2 | Dominik Ernst (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-08-08 | |||
3 | Dustin Bomheuer (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-04-17 | |||
4 | Brian Koglin (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-01-07 | |||
5 | Tobias Muller (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-07-08 | |||
8 | Thore Jacobsen (until 2020-07-05) | 1997-04-19 | |||
9 | Marcel Costly (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-11-20 | |||
15 | Henry Rorig (from 2020-07-14) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-03-03 | |||
21 | Nico Mai (from 2020-07-14) (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-03-09 | |||
24 | Alexander Bittroff (from 2020-10-07) (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-09-19 | |||
25 | Philipp Harant (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-02-20 | |||
27 | Korbinian Burger (from 2020-07-14) (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-04-27 | |||
29 | Timo Perthel (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-02-11 | |||
35 | Theo Ogbidi (until 2020-07-05) | 2001-02-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Adrian Malachowski (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-03-10 | |||
6 | Bjorn Rother (until 2020-07-05) | 1996-07-29 | |||
8 | Sebastian Jakubiak (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-06-21 | |||
10 | Jurgen Gjasula (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-12-05 | |||
14 | Maximilian Franzke (from 2020-10-04) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-03-05 | |||
16 | Andreas Muller (from 2020-07-14) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-07-20 | |||
16 | Mario Kvesic (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-01-12 | |||
20 | Soren Bertram (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-06-05 | |||
21 | Rico Preissinger (until 2020-07-05) | 1996-07-21 | |||
22 | Thore Jacobsen (from 2020-09-17) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-04-19 | |||
22 | Manfred Osei Kwadwo (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-05-30 | |||
23 | Baris Atik (from 2021-01-05) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-09 | |||
23 | Charles Elie Laprevotte (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-10-04 | |||
24 | Tarek Chahed (until 2020-07-05) | 1996-06-23 | |||
26 | Julian Weigel (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-07-14 | |||
27 | Patrick Moschl (until 2020-07-05) | 1993-03-06 | |||
28 | Raphael Obermair (from 2020-08-05) (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-04-01 | |||
31 | Nico Granatowski (from 2021-01-09) (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-06-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Marvin Temp (until 2020-09-02) | 2000-07-05 | ||||
7 | Luka Sliskovic (from 2020-08-03) (until 2022-08-30) | 1995-04-04 | |||
7 | Anthony Roczen (until 2020-10-01) | 1999-08-16 | |||
9 | Kai Brunker (from 2020-07-14) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-06-10 | |||
11 | Christian Beck (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-03-10 | |||
13 | Daniel Steininger (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-04-13 | |||
17 | Sirlord Conteh (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-07-09 | |||
18 | Florian Kath (from 2020-10-05) (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-10-21 | |||
19 | Leon Bell Bell (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-09-06 | |||
33 | Saliou Sane (from 2021-01-06) (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-07-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2020-09-13 18:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |