Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Robert Klauss (from 2020-07-30) (until 2022-10-03) | 1984-12-01 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Michael Wiesinger (until 2020-07-12) | 1972-12-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Patric Klandt (until 2022-06-30) | 1983-09-29 | |||
21 | Felix Dornebusch (until 2020-07-12) | 1994-07-12 | |||
26 | Christian Mathenia | 1992-03-31 | |||
29 | Christian Fruchtl (from 2020-08-07) (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-01-28 | |||
30 | Andreas Lukse (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-11-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Benas Satkus (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-04-01 | ||||
3 | Konstantinos Mavropanos (until 2020-07-12) | 1997-12-11 | |||
4 | Asger Sorensen (until 2022-07-20) | 1996-06-05 | |||
13 | Pius Kratschmer (from 2020-09-15) (until 2021-08-04) | 1997-06-16 | |||
19 | Philip Heise (until 2020-07-12) | 1991-06-20 | |||
21 | Kevin Goden (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-02-22 | |||
22 | Enrico Valentini | 1989-02-20 | |||
25 | Oliver Sorg (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-05-29 | |||
28 | Lukas Muhl (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-01-27 | |||
29 | Tim-Henry Handwerker (until 2024-01-24) | 1998-05-19 | |||
33 | Georg Margreitter (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-11-07 | |||
35 | Noel Knothe (from 2020-07-16) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-05-05 | |||
39 | Ekin Celebi (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-06-06 | |||
41 | Mario Suver (from 2021-01-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-09-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mats Moller Daehli (from 2021-01-25) (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-03-02 | ||||
5 | Johannes Geis (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-08-17 | |||
8 | Sarpreet Singh (from 2020-08-08) (until 2021-01-28) | 1999-02-20 | |||
10 | Nikola Dovedan (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-07-06 | |||
10 | Sebastian Kerk (until 2020-07-12) | 1994-04-17 | |||
14 | Tom Krauss (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-22 | |||
15 | Fabian Nurnberger (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-28 | |||
16 | Adam Gnezda Cerin (until 2020-08-26) | 1999-07-16 | |||
17 | Robin Hack (until 2021-08-08) | 1998-08-27 | |||
18 | Hanno Behrens (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-03-26 | |||
29 | Patrick Erras (until 2020-07-12) | 1995-01-21 | |||
36 | Simon Rhein (until 2020-12-29) | 1998-05-18 | |||
38 | Lukas Schleimer (until 2020-10-05) | 1999-12-09 | |||
40 | Linus Rosenlocher (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-09-09 | |||
43 | Tim Latteier (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-05-20 | |||
44 | Erik Shuranov (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-02-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Felix Lohkemper (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-26 | |||
9 | Manuel Schaffler (from 2020-08-14) (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
9 | Mikael Ishak (until 2020-07-12) | 1993-03-31 | |||
11 | Adam Zrelak (until 2021-02-11) | 1994-05-05 | |||
14 | Michael Frey (until 2020-07-12) | 1994-07-19 | |||
18 | Dennis Borkowski (from 2021-01-29) (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-01-26 | |||
20 | Pascal Kopke (from 2020-08-29) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-03 | |||
23 | Fabian Schleusener (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-10-24 | |||
24 | Virgil Misidjan (until 2021-01-08) | 1993-07-24 | |||
40 | Iuri Medeiros (until 2020-07-28) | 1994-07-10 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Adam Gnezda Cerin (from 2020-08-27) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-07-16 | ||||
Jakov Medic (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-09-07 | ||||
Dominik Steczyk (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-04 | ||||
Iuri Medeiros (from 2020-07-28) (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-07-10 | ||||
Lukas Schleimer (from 2020-10-05) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-12-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2020-09-12 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |