Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Urs Fischer (until 2023-11-15) | 1966-02-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Andreas Luthe (from 2020-08-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-03-10 | |||
12 | Jakob Busk (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-09-12 | |||
20 | Loris Karius (from 2020-09-28) (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-06-22 | |||
35 | Lennart Moser (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-12-06 | |||
35 | Moritz Nicolas (until 2020-08-04) | 1997-10-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Neven Subotic (until 2020-09-18) | 1988-12-10 | |||
4 | Nico Schlotterbeck (from 2020-08-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-12-01 | |||
5 | Marvin Friedrich (until 2022-01-11) | 1995-12-13 | |||
19 | Florian Hubner (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-03-01 | |||
23 | Niko Giesselmann (from 2020-07-09) (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-26 | |||
25 | Christopher Lenz (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-09-22 | |||
26 | Lars Dietz (until 2020-10-04) | 1997-01-07 | |||
28 | Christopher Trimmel | 1987-02-24 | |||
31 | Robin Knoche (from 2020-08-04) (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-05-22 | |||
33 | Lennard Maloney (until 2020-08-06) | 1999-10-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Julian Ryerson (until 2023-01-18) | 1997-11-17 | |||
7 | Akaki Gogia (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-01-18 | |||
8 | Joshua Mees (until 2020-10-05) | 1996-03-15 | |||
17 | Florian Flecker (until 2020-08-07) | 1995-10-29 | |||
21 | Grischa Promel (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-01-09 | |||
26 | Julius Kade (until 2020-08-06) | 1999-05-20 | |||
30 | Robert Andrich (until 2021-08-15) | 1994-09-22 | |||
33 | Sebastian Griesbeck (from 2020-07-07) (until 2021-08-30) | 1990-10-03 | |||
34 | Christian Gentner (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-08-14 | |||
37 | Berkan Taz (until 2020-10-05) | 1998-12-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Petar Musa (from 2021-02-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-03-04 | ||||
8 | Leon Dajaku (from 2021-01-17) (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-04-12 | |||
9 | Andreas Voglsammer (from 2021-01-01) (until 2022-08-12) | 1992-01-09 | |||
9 | Joel Pohjanpalo (from 2020-09-30) (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-09-13 | |||
10 | Max Kruse (from 2020-08-06) (until 2022-01-30) | 1988-03-19 | |||
10 | Sebastian Andersson (until 2020-09-15) | 1991-07-15 | |||
13 | Anthony Ujah (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-10-14 | |||
14 | Taiwo Awoniyi (from 2020-09-19) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-08-12 | |||
15 | Marius Bulter (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-03-29 | |||
16 | Tim Luis Maciejewski (until 2021-02-04) | 2001-03-05 | |||
16 | Laurenz Dehl (until 2020-07-31) | 2001-12-12 | |||
18 | Keita Endo (from 2020-07-25) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-11-22 | |||
20 | Suleiman Abdullahi (until 2020-08-04) | 1996-12-10 | |||
27 | Sheraldo Becker (until 2024-01-17) | 1995-02-09 | |||
32 | Marcus Ingvartsen (until 2021-08-30) | 1996-01-04 | |||
36 | Cedric Teuchert (from 2020-08-01) (until 2022-01-01) | 1997-01-14 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Tim Luis Maciejewski (from 2021-02-05) (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-03-05 | ||||
Fabio Schneider (from 2021-01-18) (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-07-31 | ||||
Nicolai Rapp (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-12-13 | ||||
Laurenz Dehl (from 2020-07-31) (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-12-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2020-09-12 18:30 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2020-12-22 20:45 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |