Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bo Svensson (from 2021-01-04) (until 2023-11-02) | 1979-08-04 | ||||
Jan-Moritz Lichte (from 2020-09-28) (until 2020-12-28) | 1980-01-12 | ||||
Achim Beierlorzer (until 2020-09-28) | 1967-11-20 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Jan Siewert (from 2020-12-28) (until 2021-01-03) | 1982-08-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Florian Muller (until 2020-09-15) | 1997-11-13 | |||
27 | Robin Zentner | 1994-10-28 | |||
27 | Robin Zentner (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-10-28 | |||
33 | Omer Hanin (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-14 | |||
37 | Finn Dahmen (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-03-27 | |||
41 | Marius Liesegang (until 2022-01-30) | 2000-01-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Ahmet Gurleyen (from 2020-07-31) (until 2020-10-05) | 1999-04-26 | ||||
2 | Ronael Pierre-Gabriel (until 2020-07-07) | 1998-06-13 | |||
3 | Aaron Caricol (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-04-22 | |||
4 | Jeremiah St. Juste (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-10-19 | |||
13 | Dimitri Lavalée (until 2021-01-17) | 1997-01-13 | |||
15 | Luca Kilian (from 2020-08-05) (until 2021-08-23) | 1999-09-01 | |||
16 | Stefan Bell | 1991-08-24 | |||
16 | Stefan Bell (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | |||
17 | Jonathan Meier (until 2020-08-05) | 1999-11-11 | |||
18 | Daniel Brosinski (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-07-17 | |||
19 | Moussa Niakhaté (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-03-08 | |||
20 | Edimilson Fernandes (until 2024-08-30) | 1996-04-15 | |||
22 | Danny da Costa (from 2021-01-22) (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-07-13 | |||
23 | Phillipp Mwene (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-01-29 | |||
42 | Alexander Hack (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-09-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerrit Holtmann (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-03-25 | ||||
5 | Jean-Paul Boetius (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-03-22 | |||
6 | Danny Latza (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-12-07 | |||
8 | Levin Oztunali (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-03-15 | |||
14 | Pierre Kunde (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-07-26 | |||
17 | Kevin Stoger (from 2020-10-07) (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-08-27 | |||
20 | Edimilson Fernandes (until 2021-08-31) | 1996-04-15 | |||
24 | Merveille Papela (until 2022-08-23) | 2001-01-18 | |||
25 | Niklas Tauer (until 2022-12-30) | 2001-02-17 | |||
26 | Paul Nebel (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-10-10 | |||
31 | Dominik Kohr (from 2021-01-18) (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-01-31 | |||
34 | Bote Baku (until 2020-10-01) | 1998-04-08 | |||
35 | Leandro Barreiro Martins (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-01-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Robert Glatzel (from 2021-02-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-01-08 | ||||
Aaron Seydel (until 2020-08-04) | 1996-02-07 | ||||
7 | Robin Quaison (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-10-09 | |||
9 | Jean-Philippe Mateta (until 2021-01-20) | 1997-06-28 | |||
11 | Dong-Won Ji (until 2021-01-28) | 1991-05-28 | |||
21 | Karim Onisiwo (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-03-17 | |||
22 | Issah Abass (until 2021-01-04) | 1998-09-26 | |||
28 | Adam Szalai (until 2022-02-16) | 1987-12-09 | |||
29 | Jonathan Burkardt | 2000-07-11 | |||
30 | Cyrill Akono (until 2021-01-24) | 2000-02-29 | |||
36 | Suliman Marlon Mustapha (until 2021-06-09) | 2001-05-24 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Ronael Pierre-Gabriel (from 2020-07-07) (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-06-13 | ||||
Suliman Marlon Mustapha (from 2021-06-09) (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-05-24 | ||||
Issah Abass (from 2021-01-04) (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-09-26 | ||||
Dimitri Lavalée (from 2021-01-18) (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-01-13 | ||||
Jean-Philippe Mateta (from 2021-01-21) (until 2022-01-30) | 1997-06-28 | ||||
Erkan Eyibil (from 2020-08-24) (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-06-15 | ||||
Dong-Won Ji (from 2021-01-29) (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-05-28 | ||||
Florian Muller (from 2020-09-15) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-11-13 | ||||
Jonathan Meier (from 2020-08-06) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-11-11 | ||||
Cyrill Akono (from 2021-01-25) (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-02-29 | ||||
3 | Aaron Caricol (from 2021-01-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-04-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2020-09-11 20:45 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2020-12-23 20:45 |
0 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |