Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hannes Wolf (from 2021-03-23) (until 2021-06-30) | 1981-04-15 | ||||
Peter Bosz (until 2021-03-22) | 1963-11-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Hermann (from 2021-03-23) (until 2021-06-30) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lukas Hradecky | 1989-11-24 | |||
21 | Lennart Grill (until 2021-08-30) | 1999-01-25 | |||
36 | Niklas Lomb | 1993-07-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Panagiotis Retsos (until 2020-10-05) | 1998-08-09 | ||||
2 | Santiago Arias (from 2020-09-24) (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-01-13 | |||
4 | Jonathan Tah | 1996-02-11 | |||
5 | Sven Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
6 | Aleksandar Dragovic (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-03-06 | |||
12 | Edmond Tapsoba | 1999-02-02 | |||
16 | Tin Jedvaj (until 2021-07-24) | 1995-11-28 | |||
18 | Wendell (until 2021-08-20) | 1993-07-20 | |||
22 | Daley Sinkgraven (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-07-04 | |||
23 | Mitchell Weiser (until 2021-08-31) | 1994-04-21 | |||
24 | Timothy Fosu-Mensah (from 2021-01-13) (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-01-02 | |||
30 | Jeremie Frimpong (from 2021-01-27) | 2000-12-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Lars Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
10 | Kerem Demirbay (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-07-03 | |||
11 | Nadiem Amiri (until 2022-01-29) | 1996-10-27 | |||
15 | Julian Baumgartlinger (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-01-02 | |||
20 | Charles Aranguiz (until 2023-04-03) | 1989-04-17 | |||
25 | Exequiel Palacios | 1998-10-05 | |||
27 | Florian Wirtz (until 2021-06-30) | 2003-05-03 | |||
28 | Demarai Gray (from 2021-01-31) (until 2021-07-22) | 1996-06-28 | |||
29 | Kai Havertz (until 2020-09-03) | 1999-06-11 | |||
30 | Adrian Stanilewicz (until 2020-08-30) | 2000-02-22 | |||
32 | Samed Onur (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-07-15 | |||
32 | Ayman Azhil (until 2020-08-31) | 2001-04-10 | |||
38 | Karim Bellarabi (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-04-08 | |||
39 | Cem Turkmen (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-03-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Paulinho (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-07-15 | |||
9 | Leon Bailey (until 2021-08-03) | 1997-08-09 | |||
13 | Lucas Alario (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-10-08 | |||
14 | Patrik Schick (from 2020-09-08) | 1996-01-24 | |||
17 | Joel Pohjanpalo (until 2020-09-30) | 1994-09-13 | |||
19 | Moussa Diaby (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-07 | |||
31 | Kevin Volland (until 2020-09-01) | 1992-07-30 | |||
37 | Emrehan Gedikli (until 2021-06-30) | 2003-04-25 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Joel Pohjanpalo (from 2020-09-30) (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-09-13 | ||||
Panagiotis Retsos (from 2020-10-05) (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-08-09 | ||||
32 | Ayman Azhil (from 2020-09-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-04-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2020-09-13 15:30 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2021-01-12 20:45 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2021-02-02 18:30 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |