Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alexander Schmidt (from 2021-04-26) (until 2022-06-30) | 1968-10-23 | ||||
Markus Kauczinski (until 2021-04-25) | 1970-02-20 | ||||
Heiko Scholz (from 2021-01-20) (until 2021-01-31) | 1966-01-07 | ||||
Athletiktrainer | |||||
Matthias Grahe (until 2024-06-30) | 1968-11-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jannis Maul (from 2021-04-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 2003-08-28 | ||||
1 | Kevin Broll (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-08-23 | |||
23 | Stefan Kiefer (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-07-10 | |||
24 | Patrick Wiegers (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-04-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Linus Wahlqvist (until 2020-08-04) | 1996-11-11 | |||
3 | Leroy Kwadwo (from 2021-01-18) (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-08-15 | |||
4 | Tim Knipping (from 2020-07-13) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-11-24 | |||
15 | Chris Lowe (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-04-16 | |||
16 | Robin Becker (from 2020-07-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-01-18 | |||
19 | Jonathan Meier (from 2020-08-06) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-11-11 | |||
22 | Niklas Kreuzer (from 2021-01-29) (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-02-20 | |||
23 | Florian Ballas (until 2020-07-31) | 1993-01-08 | |||
26 | Sebastian Mai (from 2020-07-06) (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-12-10 | |||
36 | Max Kulke (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-11-10 | |||
39 | Kevin Ehlers (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-01-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jonas Kühn (from 2021-01-01) (until 2021-08-11) | 2002-03-20 | ||||
Matthäus Taferner (until 2020-08-06) | 2001-01-30 | ||||
4 | Jannis Nikolaou (until 2020-07-13) | 1993-07-31 | |||
5 | Yannick Stark (from 2020-07-14) (until 2022-08-24) | 1990-10-28 | |||
6 | Marco Hartmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-02-25 | |||
7 | Panagiotis Vlachodimos (from 2020-07-15) (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-10-12 | |||
13 | Marvin Stefaniak (from 2020-10-05) (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-02-03 | |||
17 | Maximilian Grosser (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-07-23 | |||
20 | Julius Kade (from 2020-08-06) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-20 | |||
28 | Paul Will (from 2020-08-23) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-01 | |||
29 | Sascha Horvath (until 2020-10-04) | 1996-08-22 | |||
34 | Leon Lowe (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-12-30 | |||
36 | Max Kulke (until 2022-01-11) | 2000-11-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Heinz Morschel (from 2021-01-20) (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-08-24 | |||
8 | Osman Atilgan (until 2020-09-23) | 1999-08-01 | |||
9 | Pascal Sohm (from 2020-07-23) (until 2022-01-12) | 1991-11-02 | |||
10 | Patrick Weihrauch (from 2020-08-07) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-03-03 | |||
11 | Agyemang Diawusie (from 2020-07-24) (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-02-12 | |||
11 | Alexander Jeremejeff (until 2020-08-03) | 1993-10-12 | |||
14 | Philipp Hosiner (from 2020-07-20) (until 2022-01-11) | 1989-05-15 | |||
17 | Rene Klingenburg (until 2020-08-06) | 1993-12-29 | |||
21 | Simon Gollnack (until 2021-02-02) | 2002-01-29 | |||
33 | Christoph Daferner (from 2020-08-07) (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-01-12 | |||
35 | Ransford Konigsdorffer (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-09-13 | |||
37 | Luka Stor (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-07-05 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Vasil Kusej (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-05-24 | ||||
Alexander Jeremejeff (from 2020-08-04) (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-10-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2020-09-14 18:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2020-12-22 20:45 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |