Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jens Martens (until 2022-06-30) | 1955-10-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lars Huxsohl (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-06-10 | |||
21 | Stefan Rakocevic (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-05 | |||
32 | Marcel Kindler (until 2022-06-30) | 1982-02-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Yannik Nuxoll | 1997-09-20 | |||
4 | Juri Marxen (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-11-06 | |||
5 | Lesley Karschau (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-09-02 | |||
8 | Dane Kummerfeld | 1992-05-13 | |||
11 | Nick Gutmann (until 2024-01-09) | 1996-08-26 | |||
15 | Rico Bork (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-04-03 | |||
18 | Alexandre Rajao da Cunha (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-10-10 | |||
22 | Hamajak Bojadgian (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-10-28 | |||
27 | Fabian Grau (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-06-10 | |||
28 | Johann von Knebel Döberitz (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-08-28 | |||
55 | Fahri Akyol (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-03-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Noel Denis (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-12-23 | ||||
10 | Kang-Min Choi (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-01 | |||
13 | Philipp Koch | 1990-11-24 | |||
13 | Evans Nyarko (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-07-06 | |||
23 | Jordan Brown (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-11-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
6 | Dylan Williams (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-01-04 | |||
7 | Nils Bruning | 1994-12-24 | |||
9 | Jan Luneburg (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-10-23 | |||
14 | Corey Williams (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-01-13 | |||
17 | Bathuan Evren (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-09-05 | |||
17 | Michael Kobert (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-03-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2020-09-13 15:30 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |