Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sascha Watzlawik (until 2023-06-30) | 1978-11-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Stefan Djordjevic (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-02-08 | |||
12 | Thorsten Schmidt (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-03-25 | |||
23 | Andreas Pütz (until 2021-06-30) | 1983-06-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Marcel Horz (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-07-10 | |||
7 | Christopher Freisberg (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-02-05 | |||
13 | Albert Kudrenko (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-09-20 | |||
15 | Marian Kneuper (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-03-14 | |||
20 | Manoel Splettstosser (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-28 | |||
22 | Marcel Stieffenhofer (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-03-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Fabien Fries (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-04-23 | |||
8 | Goran Naric (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-12-16 | |||
10 | Yannik Finkenbusch (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-10-26 | |||
14 | Niklas Hermann (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-02-27 | |||
18 | Jonas Runkel (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-12-20 | |||
19 | Noel Schlesiger (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-10-22 | |||
35 | Lukas Haubrich (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-05-24 | |||
44 | Björn Kremer (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-09-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Enrico Koppen (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-07-30 | |||
11 | Kristian Grzobic (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-06-02 | |||
17 | Daniel Fiege (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-10-29 | |||
21 | Soren Klappert (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-01-29 | |||
24 | Jonathan Kap (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-12-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2020-09-12 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |