Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Mutlu Demir (until 2021-06-30) | 1974-05-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Johannes Focher (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-01-20 | |||
12 | Bülent Kubasik (until 2021-06-30) | 1976-09-08 | |||
22 | Christian Bölker (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-05-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Ali Özdemir (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-05-06 | |||
4 | Sven Wurm (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-04-11 | |||
19 | Nils Buchwalder (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-06-12 | |||
26 | Adil Elmoueden (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-05-22 | |||
27 | Til Bauman (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-03-29 | |||
78 | Brian Lengelsen (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-10-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Nik Kunkel (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-12-20 | |||
6 | Marcel Kandziora (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-02-04 | |||
10 | Hakan Demir (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-03-04 | |||
15 | Tim Treude (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-01-28 | |||
17 | Ewald Platt (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-08-25 | |||
20 | Ansgar Pflüger (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-01-09 | |||
21 | Raphael Gräßer (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-09-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Muza Manky Sesay (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-11-24 | ||||
7 | Ron Berlinski (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-08-08 | |||
9 | Andreas Spais (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-07-07 | |||
23 | Alessandro Tomasello (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-01-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2020-09-12 15:30 |
1 : 6 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |