Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rudiger Rehm (until 2021-10-25) | 1978-11-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tim Boss (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-06-28 | |||
1 | Lukas Watkowiak (until 2020-08-20) | 1996-03-06 | |||
26 | Matthias Hamrol (from 2020-08-24) (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-12-31 | |||
31 | Arthur Lyska (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-05-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Ahmet Gurleyen (from 2020-10-05) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-04-26 | |||
4 | Sascha Mockenhaupt (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-10 | |||
5 | Benedikt Rocker (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-11-19 | |||
13 | Jakov Medic (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-09-07 | |||
16 | Niklas Dams (until 2020-08-04) | 1990-05-28 | |||
17 | Florian Carstens (from 2020-07-21) (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-11-08 | |||
19 | Michel Niemeyer (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-11-19 | |||
20 | Moritz Kuhn (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-08-01 | |||
25 | Dennis Kempe (from 2020-08-25) (until 2023-06-30) | 1986-06-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Tobias Schwede (until 2021-01-30) | 1994-03-17 | |||
7 | Gianluca Korte (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-08-29 | |||
10 | Sebastian Mrowca (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-01-16 | |||
14 | Lucas Brumme (from 2021-01-02) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-09-25 | |||
15 | Paterson Chato (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-12-01 | |||
16 | Tim Walbrecht (from 2020-09-30) (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-09-18 | |||
18 | Marc Lais (from 2020-08-11) (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-02-04 | |||
22 | Marvin Ajani (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-10-04 | |||
24 | Dominik Prokop (until 2022-08-30) | 1997-06-02 | |||
27 | Michael Boris Guthorl (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-01-26 | |||
28 | Kevin Lankford (from 2021-01-28) (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-11-16 | |||
37 | Ben Bischof (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-09-20 | |||
40 | Giona Leibold (until 2020-08-05) | 2000-08-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Cedric Euschen (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-03-07 | ||||
8 | Johannes Wurtz (from 2020-08-18) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-06-19 | |||
9 | Phillip Tietz (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-07-09 | |||
11 | Maurice Malone (from 2020-08-05) (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-08-17 | |||
21 | Benedict Hollerbach (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-05-17 | |||
29 | Gustaf Nilsson (from 2021-01-05) (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-05-23 | |||
32 | Stefan Aigner (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-08-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2020-09-13 18:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2020-12-23 20:45 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |