Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Michael Kollner (until 2023-01-31) | 1969-12-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gunter Brandl (until 2022-06-30) | 1962-08-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marco Hiller | 1997-02-20 | |||
12 | Gyorgy Szekely (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-06-02 | |||
39 | Hendrik Bonmann (until 2020-07-05) | 1994-01-22 | |||
40 | Tom Kretzschmar (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-01-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Eric Weeger (until 2020-07-05) | 1997-02-02 | |||
3 | Niklas Lang (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-06-13 | |||
4 | Felix Weber (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-01-18 | |||
6 | Stephan Salger (from 2020-09-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-01-30 | |||
13 | Dennis Erdmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-11-22 | |||
17 | Daniel Wein (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-02-05 | |||
22 | Aaron Berzel (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-05-29 | |||
23 | Tim Rieder (until 2020-07-05) | 1993-09-03 | |||
25 | Marius Willsch (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-03-18 | |||
27 | Semi Belkahia (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-12-22 | |||
28 | Herbert Paul (until 2020-07-05) | 1994-02-11 | |||
32 | Maxim Gresler (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-06-03 | |||
33 | Leon Klassen (until 2021-06-30) | 2000-05-29 | |||
36 | Phillipp Steinhart (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-07-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Quirin Moll (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-01-21 | |||
8 | Eric Tallig (from 2020-07-23) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-01-10 | |||
8 | Simon Seferings (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-07-05 | |||
10 | Timo Gebhart (until 2020-07-05) | 1989-04-12 | |||
14 | Dennis Dressel (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-10-26 | |||
16 | Benjamin Kindsvater (until 2020-07-05) | 1993-02-08 | |||
18 | Lorenz Knöferl (until 2023-01-30) | 2003-05-04 | |||
20 | Ahanna Agbowo (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-08-11 | |||
20 | Efkan Bekiroglu (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-09-14 | |||
23 | Keanu Staude (from 2021-01-29) (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-01-26 | |||
28 | Marco Mannhardt (until 2023-01-01) | 2002-07-04 | |||
31 | Richard Neudecker (from 2020-09-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-10-29 | |||
34 | Kristian Bohnlein (until 2020-07-05) | 1990-05-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Stefan Lex (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-11-27 | |||
9 | Sascha Molders (until 2021-12-19) | 1985-03-20 | |||
11 | Fabian Greilinger (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-09-13 | |||
18 | Nico Karger (until 2020-07-05) | 1993-02-01 | |||
19 | Merveille Biankadi (from 2020-12-23) (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-05-09 | |||
19 | Martin Pusic (from 2020-09-15) (until 2020-12-08) | 1987-10-24 | |||
19 | Noel Niemann (until 2020-07-05) | 1999-11-14 | |||
21 | Johann Ngounou Djayo (from 2020-07-21) (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-02-27 | |||
21 | Prince Osei Owusu (until 2020-07-05) | 1997-01-07 | |||
22 | Tim Linsbichler (from 2020-09-15) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-14 | |||
24 | Markus Ziereis (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-08-26 | |||
26 | Matthew Durrans (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-12-10 | |||
30 | Milos Cocic (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-06-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2020-09-12 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |