Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Reis (until 2022-09-12) | 1973-10-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Markus Gellhaus (until 2022-06-30) | 1970-06-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Manuel Riemann (until 2024-06-30) | 1988-09-09 | |||
1 | Tjark Ernst (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-15 | |||
25 | Patrick Drewes (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-02-04 | |||
34 | Paul Grave (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Cristian Gamboa | 1989-10-24 | |||
3 | Danilo Soares (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-10-29 | |||
4 | Erhan Masovic (from 2020-10-05) | 1998-11-22 | |||
5 | Saulo Decarli (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-02-04 | |||
11 | Herbert Bockhorn (from 2020-07-30) (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-01-31 | |||
24 | Vassilios Lambropoulos (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-03-31 | |||
29 | Maxim Leitsch (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-05-18 | |||
33 | Moritz Romling (until 2021-01-06) | 2001-04-30 | |||
37 | Armel Bella Kotchap (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-12-11 | |||
38 | Stylianos Kokovas (until 2021-01-11) | 2001-07-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Verthomy Schilo Boboy (until 2021-06-30) | 2003-04-19 | ||||
7 | Sebastian Maier (until 2021-01-20) | 1993-09-18 | |||
8 | Anthony Losilla | 1986-03-10 | |||
10 | Thomas Eisfeld (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-01-18 | |||
13 | Raman Chibsah (from 2020-09-18) (until 2022-02-02) | 1993-03-10 | |||
20 | Vitaly Janelt (until 2020-10-03) | 1998-05-10 | |||
23 | Robert Tesche (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-05-27 | |||
26 | Lars Holtkamp (until 2021-01-02) | 2001-11-21 | |||
32 | Robert Zulj (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-02-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Simon Zoller (until 2023-09-01) | 1991-06-26 | |||
14 | Tom Weilandt (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-04-27 | |||
15 | Soma Novothny (from 2020-09-07) (until 2022-01-02) | 1994-06-16 | |||
17 | Danny Blum (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-01-07 | |||
19 | Tarsis Bonga (from 2020-07-13) (until 2023-01-24) | 1997-01-10 | |||
27 | Milos Pantovic (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-07-07 | |||
28 | Luis Hartwig (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-11-23 | |||
30 | Baris Ekincier (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-03-24 | |||
35 | Silvere Ganvoula (until 2022-01-25) | 1996-06-22 | |||
verliehen | |||||
26 | Lars Holtkamp (from 2021-01-03) (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-11-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2020-09-12 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2020-12-23 20:45 |
0 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-02-03 18:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |